Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] |
24.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] |
09.04.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] |
16.10.2009 | (Expected) grant | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] |
07.10.2009 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
07.10.2009 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
07.07.2009 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
07.07.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.07.2008 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
08.07.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
11.04.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] |
21.03.2008 | Definitive list of designations | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] |
19.03.2008 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
22.02.2008 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] |
13.07.2007 | Publication of search report | published on 15.08.2007 [2007/33] |
11.07.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.07.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.02.2005 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.04.2005 [2005/15] |