EP1522837 - Procedure for testing the tightness of a pressurised suspension strut [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 71287 Weissach / DE | ||
Former [2005/15] | For all designated states Dr.Ing. h.c.F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wiesemann, Stefan Waldackerweg 83 73732 Esslingen / DE | [2005/15] | Application number, filing date | 04015008.8 | 25.06.2004 | [2005/15] | Priority number, date | DE20031046979 | 09.10.2003 Original published format: DE 10346979 | [2005/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1522837 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1522837 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | [2007/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1522837 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/20, G01M3/22 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
G01M3/20 (EP);
G01M3/226 (EP);
G01M3/227 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2008/17] |
Former [2005/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Dichtigkeitsprüfung eines druckluftbeaufschlagten Federbeines | [2005/15] | English: | Procedure for testing the tightness of a pressurised suspension strut | [2005/15] | French: | Procédé d'essai de l'étanchéité d'une jambe de suspension pressurisée | [2005/15] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 16.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 28.02.2010 | GB | 25.06.2010 | [2011/35] |
Former [2010/19] | ES | 28.02.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1293569 (MOLITOR VICTOR DAVID [US]) [A] 1-3 * page 1, line 53 - line 70 * * page 1, line 84 - page 2, line 18 ** page 1, line 17 - line 31 *; | [A]DE29608465U (VARIAN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document * |