EP1494158 - Method and apparatus for managing data received from a medical device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [2016/49] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07414-1880 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arndt, Dave 9 Oxford Road North Caldwell NJ 07006 / US | 02 /
Upham, Paul 29 Mariners Cove Edgewater, NJ 07020-1289 / US | 03 /
Gibney, Michael One Haller Crescent Chestnut Ridge NY 10977-6602 / US | 04 /
Gravel, Marian 29 Greenwood Drive Newburgh NY 12550 / US | 05 /
Friedel, Betty 123 Highgate Terrage Bergenfield NJ 07621 / US | 06 /
Yao, Raymond 517 Bloomfield Street, No. 4 Hoboken NJ 07030-4957 / US | 07 /
Puma, Michael 15 Woodside Avenue Midland Park NJ 07432 / US | 08 /
Grauer, Carl 519 Sixth Avenue, No. 3 Brooklyn NY 11215 / US | 09 /
Griffin, Phyllis 90 Upper Lakeview Avenue Ringwood NJ 07456 / US | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2005/01] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 04015067.4 | 26.06.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | US20030483246P | 30.06.2003 Original published format: US 483246 P | US20030483248P | 30.06.2003 Original published format: US 483248 P | US20030483249P | 30.06.2003 Original published format: US 483249 P | US20030483250P | 30.06.2003 Original published format: US 483250 P | US20030483251P | 30.06.2003 Original published format: US 483251 P | US20030483252P | 30.06.2003 Original published format: US 483252 P | US20030483253P | 30.06.2003 Original published format: US 483253 P | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1494158 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1494158 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
G16H10/60 (EP,US);
G16H15/00 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2013/52] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zur Verwaltung von Daten empfangen aus einem medizinischen Gerät | [2005/01] | English: | Method and apparatus for managing data received from a medical device | [2005/01] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de gestion de données reçues d'un appareil médical | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 23.11.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/51] | 04.11.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/51] | Appeal following examination | 17.02.2017 | Appeal received No. T1129/17 | 25.04.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.11.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6004276 (WRIGHT GREGORY JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-3,20-22,39-41 * column 10, lines 48-49 * * column 42, line 54 - column 46, line 65 * * column 69, lines 54-56 ** column 75, lines 50-57 *; | [I]US2002193679 (MALAVE LUIS J [US], et al) [I] 1-3,20-22,39-41 * figures 17-29 * * paragraphs [0064] , [0 77] , [0 83] , [ 102] , [ 111] , [ 112] , [ 125] *; | [I]US6516324 (JONES JEFFREY R [US], et al) [I] 1-3,20-22,39-41 * abstract * * column 3, line 23 - column 7, line 48 * * column 11, lines 32-37 * * column 13, lines 24-25 * * figure 3 * |