EP1612720 - Method for digitizing of handwritten data acquired on forms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2007 [2007/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GbD Gesellschaft für beleglose Dokumentenbearbeitung mbH Hindenburgstrasse 162 22297 Hamburg / DE | For all designated states Portal Systems Consulting GmbH Feldbrunnenstrasse 50 20148 Hamburg / DE | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoseas, André Bültenkoppel 58a 22399 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Jung, Peter Heidberg 35 22301 Hamburg / DE | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04015093.0 | 28.06.2004 | [2006/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1612720 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/22, G06F3/033 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
G06F3/03545 (EP,US);
G06F3/0321 (EP);
G06F3/04883 (EP);
G06V30/1423 (EP,US);
G06V30/1444 (EP,US);
G06V30/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/36] |
Former [2006/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Digitalisieren von handschriftlich auf Formularen erfassten Daten | [2006/01] | English: | Method for digitizing of handwritten data acquired on forms | [2006/01] | French: | Procédé de numérisation de données manuscrites acquises en formulaires | [2006/01] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/12] | 03.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.08.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.08.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0175781 (ANOTO AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 23 * * page 4, paragraph 23 - paragraph 34 * * page 5, line 30 - page 7, line 22 *; | [A]US2002033414 (FAHRAEUS CHRISTER [SE], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] *; | [A]US2002035687 (SKANTZE KRISTOFER [SE]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] *; | [Y] - K. ISHIGAKI, "Interactive Character Recognition Technology for Pen-based Computers", FUJITSU SCI TECH. J., (199912), vol. 35, no. 2, pages 191 - 201, XP002293425 [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * page 193, column L, paragraph 2 - page 196, column L, paragraph 1 * | [A] - JIM TERRY ET AL., "Recognizing the Truth about Classifier Recognition", PARASCRIPT LLC WHITE PAPER, (20020519), pages 1 - 13, URL: http://www.parascript.com/support/whitepapers.cfm, (20040819), XP002293426 [A] 1-8 * page 6, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 7, paragraph 6 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 11, paragraph 4 - page 12, paragraph 2 * | [A] - A. F. R. RAHMAN ET AL., "Multiple Classifier Decision Combination strategies for Character Recognition: A review", INT. JOURNAL ON DOCUMENT ANALYSIS AND RECOGNITION, (200306), pages 166 - 194, XP002293428 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 166, column L * * page 168, column R, paragraph 3 - page 169, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10032-002-0090-8 | [L] - PARASCRIPT LLC, "Technical Support - White Papers", (2004), URL: http://www.parascript.com/support/whitepapers.cfm, (20040819), XP002293427 [L] * Link auf Terry et al. mit Angabe des Veröffentlichungsdatums. * |