EP1493367 - Toaster-cum-microwave oven [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daewoo Electronics Corporation 686, Ahyeon-Dong Mapo-Gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Daewoo Electronics Corporation 686, Ahyeon-Dong Mapo-Gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yu, Hak Seok Daewoo Electronics Corporation 686 Ahyeon-dong Mapo-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Kim, Seung Hoe Daewoo Electronics Corporation 686 Ahyeon-dong Mapo-gu Seoul / KR | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich R., Dipl.-Phys., et al SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04015266.2 | 29.06.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | KR20030020731 | 30.06.2003 Original published format: KR 2003020731 | KR20030071246 | 14.10.2003 Original published format: KR 2003071246 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1493367 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1493367 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/08 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
A47J37/085 (EP,US);
H05B6/687 (EP,US);
H05B2206/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2005/47] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mikrowellenofen mit eingebautem Toaster | [2005/01] | English: | Toaster-cum-microwave oven | [2005/01] | French: | Four à micro-ondes avec grille-pain | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/41] | 03.09.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.12.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 11.10.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/48] | Divisional application(s) | EP07019964.1 / EP1878371 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.10.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1588795 (ROWENTA WERKE GMBH) [A] 2,4* page 3, line 86 - line 92; figure 2 *; | [Y]US5692432 (HAZAN JEAN-PIERRE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-4 * column 1, line 24 - line 59 * * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 15 * * column 7, line 51 - column 8, line 15; figures 1,2,5 *; | [Y]EP1213948 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1-4 * column 4, line 7 - column 7, line 58; figures 3-7 * | by applicant | US6539840 |