EP1498203 - End Mill [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.2014 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LMT Fette Werkzeugtechnik GmbH & Co. KG Grabauer Strasse 24 21493 Schwarzenbek / DE | [2014/48] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states Fette GmbH Grabauer Strasse 24 21493 Schwarzenbek / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kölker, Werner Marienburger Strasse 17 a 23909 Ratzeburg / DE | 02 /
Rohr, Olaf Auf den Wischhöfen 8 21493 Sahms / DE | 03 /
Schunk, Uwe Triftstrasse 104a 23554 Lübeck / DE | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/50] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2005/03] | Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, Schildberg Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04015346.2 | 30.06.2004 | [2005/03] | Priority number, date | DE2003210713U | 12.07.2003 Original published format: DE 20310713 U | [2005/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1498203 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1498203 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | [2006/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1498203 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/12] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1498203 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/10 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
B23C5/10 (EP,US);
B23C5/109 (EP,US);
B23C2210/084 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1908 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1948 (EP,US);
Y10T408/909 (EP,US);
Y10T409/30952 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Title | German: | Stirnfräser | [2005/03] | English: | End Mill | [2005/03] | French: | Fraise à queue | [2005/03] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 11.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.12.2008
08.01.2009
ADMISSIBLE Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE Opponent's representative Köppen, Manfred, et al, et al WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.12.2008
Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE Opponent's representative Köppen, Manfred, et al, et al Weber Seiffert Lieke, Patentanwälte, Taunusstrasse 5a 65183 Wiesbaden / DE | 27.01.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.07.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.12.2010 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.12.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.07.2014 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.10.2014 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 11.02.2011 | Appeal received No. T0320/11 | 12.04.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.07.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.03.2008 | DK | 19.03.2008 | EE | 19.03.2008 | FI | 19.03.2008 | IE | 19.03.2008 | NL | 19.03.2008 | RO | 19.03.2008 | SI | 19.03.2008 | SK | 19.03.2008 | TR | 19.03.2008 | BG | 19.06.2008 | SE | 19.06.2008 | GR | 20.06.2008 | BE | 30.06.2008 | ES | 30.06.2008 | GB | 30.06.2008 | LU | 30.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | PT | 26.08.2008 | HU | 20.09.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 19.03.2008 | |
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
TR | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
GB | 30.06.2008 | ||
LU | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
HU | 20.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 19.03.2008 | |
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
GB | 30.06.2008 | ||
LU | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
HU | 20.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 19.03.2008 | |
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
GB | 30.06.2008 | ||
LU | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/44] | CY | 19.03.2008 | |
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
GB | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | DK | 19.03.2008 | |
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
GB | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 19.03.2008 | |
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | DK | 19.03.2008 | |
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | DK | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 19.03.2008 | |
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | FI | 19.03.2008 | |
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 19.03.2008 | |
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | FI | 19.03.2008 | |
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 19.03.2008 | |
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 19.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002292515 ; | [A]JPH11156620 ; | [A]JPH11239911 ; | [A]US5964555 (STRAND BENGT [SE]) [A] 1,14 * column 2 - column 3; figure - *; | [A]US6158927 (COLE JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 1,15-17 * column 4, line 12 - column 8, line 48; figures 1-16,22-26 *; | [DA]DE10052963 (TOSHIBA TUNGALOY CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1,3,6,10,11,15 * column 3, line 9 - column 5, line 6; figures 1A-4 *; | [PXA]WO03103880 (SANDVIK AB [SE], et al) [PX] 1,4,11,14 * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 8; figures 2a,2b; claims 1-6,8-12 * [PA] 2,6; | [T]WO2004069457 (SECO TOOLS AB [SE]) [T] 1-3,8,11,14 * page 2 - page 6; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030205), vol. 2003, no. 02, & JP2002292515 A 20021008 (HITACHI TOOL ENGINEERING LTD) [A] 1-3,8-10,14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990930), vol. 1999, no. 11, & JP11156620 A 19990615 (HITACHI TOOL ENG LTD) [A] 1,3,6,8,14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, & JP11239911 A 19990907 (HITACHI TOOL ENG LTD) [A] 1,15-17 * abstract * | Opposition | US4300862 | US5087159 | JPH06126521 |