EP1477122 - Implant for fixing bone plates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aesculap AG Am Aesculap-Platz 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [2008/38] |
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states AESCULAP AG & Co. KG Am Aesculap-Platz 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | ||
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states Aesculap AG & Co. KG Am Aesculap-Platz 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nesper, Markus Rote Strasse 23 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | 02 /
Steinhilper, Klaus-Dieter Kolpingweg 45 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | 03 /
Weisshaupt, Dieter Bachzimmerer Ösch 10 78194 Immendingen / DE | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | Regelmann, Thomas HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | Regelmann, Thomas, Dr. HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04015445.2 | 23.05.2002 | [2004/47] | Priority number, date | DE2001128917 | 15.06.2001 Original published format: DE 10128917 | [2004/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1477122 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1477122 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | [2004/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1477122 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/68 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
A61B17/688 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/47] | Title | German: | Implantat zur Fixierung von Knochenplatten | [2004/47] | English: | Implant for fixing bone plates | [2004/47] | French: | Implant destiné à la fixation de plaques d'osteosynthése | [2004/47] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 30.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02743080.0 / EP1460951 | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.07.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.11.2008 | DK | 12.11.2008 | FI | 12.11.2008 | IE | 12.11.2008 | NL | 12.11.2008 | TR | 12.11.2008 | GR | 13.02.2009 | PT | 13.04.2009 | AT | 23.05.2009 | LU | 23.05.2009 | BE | 31.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | DK | 12.11.2008 | |
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
AT | 23.05.2009 | ||
LU | 23.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | DK | 12.11.2008 | |
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
AT | 23.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/38] | DK | 12.11.2008 | |
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
AT | 23.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | DK | 12.11.2008 | |
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | DK | 12.11.2008 | |
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | DK | 12.11.2008 | |
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | DK | 12.11.2008 | |
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 12.11.2008 | |
NL | 12.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5021059 (KENSEY KENNETH [US], et al) [X] 1* column 11, line 62 - column 12, line 7; figure 11 *; | [A]US5921986 (BONUTTI PETER M [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE29919090U (AESCULAP AG & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 20, line 30 - page 26, line 16 * * page 38, line 14 - page 45, line 9 * * figures 1-3,13-17; claims 52-56 * |