EP1528677 - Film acoustically-coupled transformer with two reverse c-axis piezoelectric elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avago Technologies Wireless IP (Singapore) Pte. Ltd. No. 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapore 768923 / SG | [2006/52] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) Pte. Ltd No. 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapore 768923 / SG | ||
Former [2006/19] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94306 / US | ||
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larson, John D. III 143 Tennyson Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 02 /
Oshmyansky, Yuri 499 Nyes Place Laguna Beach, CA 92651 / US | [2005/18] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2005/18] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04015552.5 | 01.07.2004 | [2005/18] | Priority number, date | US20030699481 | 30.10.2003 Original published format: US 699481 | US20040836663 | 29.04.2004 Original published format: US 836663 | [2005/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1528677 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1528677 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/58 | [2005/18] | CPC: |
H03H9/605 (EP,US);
H03H9/132 (EP,US);
H03H9/584 (EP,US);
H03H9/587 (EP,US);
Y10T29/42 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4902 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/04] |
Former [2005/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Akustisch gekoppelter Dünnschicht-Transformator mit zwei piezoelektrischen Elementen, welche entgegengesetzte C-Axen Orientierung besitzten | [2005/18] | English: | Film acoustically-coupled transformer with two reverse c-axis piezoelectric elements | [2005/18] | French: | Transformateur à couplage acoustique de couches minces avec deux éléments piézoélectriques à axe-c inversé | [2005/18] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 25.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003128081 (ELLA JUHA [FI], et al); |