EP1612627 - Bi-material autocompensating hairspring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nivarox-FAR S.A. Avenue du Collège 10 CH-2400 Le Locle / CH | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Verardo, Marco Au Jourez 2336 Les Bois / CH | 02 /
Conus, Thierry Oberereggen 5a 2543 Lengnau / CH | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Fbg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2009/19] | Rossand, Isabelle, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets S.A. Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2008/52] | Rossand, Isabelle, et al ICB Ingenieurs Conseils en Brevets Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | ||
Former [2006/01] | Thérond, Gérard Raymond, et al I C B Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 04015580.6 | 02.07.2004 | [2006/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1612627 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1612627 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G04B17/06 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
G04B17/066 (EP,KR,US);
G04B17/20 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Title | German: | Spiralfeder aus zwei Materialen mit Selbstkompensation | [2006/01] | English: | Bi-material autocompensating hairspring | [2006/01] | French: | Spiral autocompensateur bi-matière | [2006/01] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 24.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/15] | Request for further processing for: | 23.05.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 23.05.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.06.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.05.2009 | CY | 06.05.2009 | CZ | 06.05.2009 | DK | 06.05.2009 | EE | 06.05.2009 | FI | 06.05.2009 | IE | 06.05.2009 | IT | 06.05.2009 | NL | 06.05.2009 | PL | 06.05.2009 | RO | 06.05.2009 | SI | 06.05.2009 | SK | 06.05.2009 | TR | 06.05.2009 | LU | 02.07.2009 | BE | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | BG | 06.08.2009 | SE | 06.08.2009 | GR | 07.08.2009 | ES | 17.08.2009 | PT | 06.09.2009 | HU | 07.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
IT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
LU | 02.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
HU | 07.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
IT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
LU | 02.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
IT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/29] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | ES | 17.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]CH327796 (HORLOGERIE SUISSE S A ASUAG [CH], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 1, lines 1-32 * * page 2, lines 9-16 * * figures 1-11 * [A] 6,7; | [XA]EP1431844 (SFT SERVICES SA [CH]) [X] 6,7 * claims 1,12,15 * * table 1 * * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] * * figure 8 * * abstract * [A] 1-5; | [E]EP1445670 (ETA SA MFT HORLOGERE SUISSE [CH]) [E] 6,7 * claims 8,12-14 ** paragraph [0025] * | by applicant | CH327796 |