EP1495678 - Gas for slaughterhouse [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Messer Group GmbH Otto-Volger-Strasse 3c 65843 Sulzbach / DE | [2005/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hennequin, James rue du Général du Gaulle, 65BIS 77410 Annet sur Marne / FR | [2005/02] | Application number, filing date | 04015744.8 | 05.07.2004 | [2005/02] | Priority number, date | DE2003130737 | 07.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10330737 | [2005/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1495678 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1495678 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A22B3/00 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
A22B3/005 (EP);
A22B3/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/02] | Title | German: | Schlachtgas | [2005/02] | English: | Gas for slaughterhouse | [2005/02] | French: | Gaz pour un abattoir | [2005/02] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 30.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.02.2008 | FI | 20.02.2008 | IE | 20.02.2008 | TR | 20.02.2008 | SE | 20.05.2008 | GR | 21.05.2008 | GB | 05.07.2008 | PT | 21.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 20.02.2008 | |
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 20.02.2008 | ||
TR | 20.02.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
GB | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 20.02.2008 | |
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 20.02.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
GB | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | FI | 20.02.2008 | |
IE | 20.02.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
GB | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | FI | 20.02.2008 | |
IE | 20.02.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 20.02.2008 | |
IE | 20.02.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | FI | 20.02.2008 | |
IE | 20.02.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | FI | 20.02.2008 | |
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 20.02.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2526037 (MURPHY LAURENCE W) [X] 1-7,9,10 * column 1, lines 1-4 * * column 2, lines 30-56 * [Y] 8; | [X]US3230577 (HUGHES ALVIN W) [X] 1-7,9,10 * column 1, lines 11-41 * * column 4, lines 33-38 *; | [A]WO9427425 (SUN VALLEY POULTRY [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0664957 (ANGLIA AUTOFLOW LTD [GB]) [Y] 8 * abstract *; | [A]US6174228 (GRIMSLAND AAGE [NO], et al) [A] 1-10* column 2, lines 23-54 * |