EP1496667 - Network access to partial document images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | ||
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gormish, Michael, Ricoh Innovations, Inc. California Res.Center 2882 Sand Hill Rd. Suite 115 Menlo Park CA 94025-7022 / US | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04015862.8 | 06.07.2004 | [2005/02] | Priority number, date | US20030614877P | 07.07.2003 Original published format: US 614877 P | [2005/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1496667 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1496667 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04N7/26, G06T9/00 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
G06F3/1288 (EP,US);
H04N19/63 (EP,US);
H04N19/645 (EP,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2005/39] |
Former [2005/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Netzwerkzugriff für partielle Dokumentenbilder | [2005/02] | English: | Network access to partial document images | [2005/02] | French: | Accès de documents pour image partielle | [2005/02] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 18.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.08.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 29.04.2009 | NL | 29.04.2009 | ES | 09.08.2009 | [2011/14] |
Former [2009/50] | NL | 29.04.2009 | |
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | ES | 09.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - TAUBMAN D ET AL, "Architecture, philosophy, and performance of JPIP: internet protocol standard for JPEG2000", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (2003), vol. 5150, no. 1, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 791 - 805, XP002282186 [X] 1-3,26-29,35,39-44 * abstract * * page 791 - page 796, paragraph 2 * * page 800, paragraph 3 - page 802, paragraph 1 * * page 805, paragraph 3 * [Y] 4-25,30-34,36-38 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.502889 | [L] - SPIE, "Abstract Publication", URL: http://bookstore.spie.org/index.cfm?fuseaction=DetailPaper&ProductId=502889&coden=, (20041008), XP002300615 [L] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.502889 | [DY] - ROBERT BUCKLEY, LOUIS SHARPE, SHIGETAKA OGAWA, "JPEG 2000 Image coding system: compound image file format, ISO/IEC CD15444-6", ISO IEC, (20010309), URL: http://www.itscj.ipsj.or.jp/sc29/open/29view/29n4124t.pdf, (20041005), XP002300616 [DY] 4-25,30-34,36-38 * page 2 * * page 6 - page 13 * * page 37 * | [A] - BOLIEK M ET AL, "JPEG 2000 FOR EFFICIENT IMAGING IN A CLIENT/SERVER ENVIRONMENT", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (20010731), vol. 4472, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 212 - 223, XP008010308 [A] 1-44 * abstract * * page 212 - page 219, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.449754 | [DA] - ROBERT PANDOLINI,SCOTT HOUCHIN, GREG COLYER, "JPEG 2000 IMAGE CODING SYSTEM - PART 9: INTERACTIVITY TOOLS, APIS AND PROTOCOLS - CD 1.0", ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG1 N2904, XX, XX, (20030314), pages 1 - 7,1, XP001150721 [DA] 1-44 * page 1 - page 2 * * page 62 - page 71 * | [A] - HOUCHIN J S ET AL, "File format technology in JPEG 2000 enables flexible use of still and motion sequences", SIGNAL PROCESSING. IMAGE COMMUNICATION, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (200201), vol. 17, no. 1, ISSN 0923-5965, pages 131 - 144, XP004326803 [A] 1-44 * page 131 - page 133 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0923-5965(01)00023-6 | [A] - MARCELLIN M W ET AL, "An overview of JPEG-2000", DATA COMPRESSION CONFERENCE, 2000. PROCEEDINGS. DCC 2000 SNOWBIRD, UT, USA 28-30 MARCH 2000, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (20000328), ISBN 0-7695-0592-9, pages 523 - 541, XP010377392 [A] 1-44 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DCC.2000.838192 | [A] - TAUBMAN D, Proposal and Implementation of JPIP (Jpeg2000 Internet Protocol) in Kakadu v3.3, (20020809), XP002260543 [A] 1-44 * page 3 * |