EP1489456 - Method of manufacturing an electrochromic variable reflectance mirror with a gelled electrochromic medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/52] | An electrochromic variable reflectance mirror with glass elements and a gelled electrochromic medium | ||
[2016/48] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gentex Corporation 600 North Centennial Street Zeeland, MI 49464 / US | [2004/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ash, Kevin L. 2540 South Winesap Court N. E. Grand Rapids, MI 49505 / US | 02 /
Tonar, William L. 40 Cheyenne Holland, MI 49424 / US | 03 /
Bauer, Frederick T. 236 Dyken Avenue Holland, MI 49424 / US | [2006/01] |
Former [2005/09] | 01 /
* * * | ||
02 /
Tonar, William L. 40 Cheyenne Holland, MI 49424 / US | |||
03 /
Bauer, Frederick T. 236 Dyken Avenue Holland, MI 49424 / US | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/52] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 04015933.7 | 26.03.1998 | [2004/52] | Priority number, date | US19970834783 | 02.04.1997 Original published format: US 834783 | [2004/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1489456 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/15, G02F1/161 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
C09K9/02 (EP,US);
B60R1/088 (EP,US);
G02F1/1503 (EP,US);
G02F1/161 (EP,US);
G02F1/15165 (EP,US);
G02F2001/1502 (EP,US);
G02F2001/15145 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/52] | G02F1/157, C09K9/02, B60R1/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/52] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für einen elektrochromen Spiegel mit variabler Reflexion bestehend aus einem gellierten elektrochromen Medium | [2016/48] | English: | Method of manufacturing an electrochromic variable reflectance mirror with a gelled electrochromic medium | [2016/48] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'une rétroviseur électrochrome à réflectance variable comportant un support électrochrome gélifié | [2016/48] |
Former [2004/52] | Elektrochromer Spiegel mit variabler Reflexion bestehend aus dünnen Glaselementen und einem gellierten elektrochromen Medium | ||
Former [2004/52] | An electrochromic variable reflectance mirror with glass elements and a gelled electrochromic medium | ||
Former [2004/52] | Retroviseur electrochrome a reflectance variable comportant deux elements en verre mince et un support electrochrome gelifie | Examination procedure | 07.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 07.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/39] | 12.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/39] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98913140.4 / EP0990194 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980913140) is 09.12.2002 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 20   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]US4902108 (BYKER HARLAN J [US]) [YD] 1,20,40 * column 4, line 28 - column 10, line 37 * * column 11, line 6 - column 12, line 65 * * column 21, line 42 - column 24, line 16 * [A] 2-4,21,24,27,32,33,37,38,41,42; | [A]EP0612826 (DONNELLY CORP [US]) [A] 1,5,7-10,17,20,21,27,33,38,40 * page 3, line 36 - page 16, line 49 * * page 17, line 32 - page 18, line 23 * * page 20, line 17 - page 21, line 22 ** page 23, line 20 - page 27, line 31 *; | [YA]WO9603475 (GENTEX CORP [US]) [Y] 1,20,40 * page 8, line 22 - page 13, line 19 * * examples 2,3,11,12; claim 72 * [A] 5,27,33 | by applicant | US4902108 | US5128799 | US5278693 | US5280380 | US5282077 | US5294376 | US5336448 | EP0612826 | WO9603475 |