Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] |
14.11.2006 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.08.2006 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
19.08.2006 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
19.08.2006 | New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
18.08.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 20.09.2006 [2006/38] |
02.12.2005 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] |