Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006003018 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2006 | A3 | WO2006003018 | 12.01.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP04016011 | 07.07.2004 | US59345405 | 15.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8093458 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2012 | B2 | US2008057563 | 06.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04016011 | 07.07.2004 | US63171905 | 07.07.2005 | WO2005EP07361 | 07.07.2005 | US59345405 | 15.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20070039587 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04016011 | 07.07.2004 | US59345405 | 15.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008505622 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04016011 | 07.07.2004 | WO2005EP07361 | 07.07.2005 | US59345405 | 15.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2336335 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2011 | A3 | EP2336335 | 22.06.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP04016011 | 07.07.2004 | EP05756226 | 07.07.2005 | EP10011720 | 07.07.2005 | US59345405 | 15.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1763581 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2013 | B1 | EP1763581 | 21.03.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP04016011 | 07.07.2004 | WO2005EP07361 | 07.07.2005 | EP05756226 | 07.07.2005 | US59345405 | 15.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2571029 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2015 | C | CA2571029 | 12.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04016011 | 07.07.2004 | WO2005EP07361 | 07.07.2005 | US59345405 | 15.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005259335B | Global Dossier | 27.08.2009 | B2 | AU2005259335 | 12.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04016011 | 07.07.2004 | WO2005EP07361 | 07.07.2005 | US59345405 | 15.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0513142 | 29.04.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04016011 | 07.07.2004 | WO2005EP07361 | 07.07.2005 | US59345405 | 15.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA06014603 | 05.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04016011 | 07.07.2004 | WO2005EP07361 | 07.07.2005 | US59345405 | 15.01.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1616959 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04016011 | 07.07.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1981042 | 13.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04016011 | 07.07.2004 |