EP1464412 - Coated parts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77, Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai-ku, Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | ||
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states Shimano Inc. 77 Oimatsu-cho 3-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8577 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishimura, Yasushi 17-8 Koumyodai 1-cho Izumi-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Hosoya, Yasunori 2-18-34-404 Tadaoka-higashi Tadaoka-cho Senboku-gun Osaka / JP | 03 /
Sakurai, Tomoharu Chisan Manshon Kinokawa 204 1-ban 427-banchi Awa Wakayama-shi Wakayama / JP | 04 /
Nishiku, Chiyo 15-4 Miikedai 4-cho Sakai-shi Osaka / JP | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Murnane, Graham John, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Murnane, Graham John, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2004/41] | Murnane, Graham John, et al Murgitroyd & Company, Scotland House, 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04016315.6 | 07.06.2000 | [2004/41] | Priority number, date | JP19990161142 | 08.06.1999 Original published format: JP 16114299 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1464412 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1464412 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B05D7/14, A01K89/00, B62M3/00, B05D7/00, B05D7/02 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
B05D7/14 (EP,US);
A01K89/00 (EP);
A01K89/01121 (EP,US);
A01K89/0192 (EP,US);
B05D7/02 (EP,US);
B05D7/04 (US);
B62K3/00 (EP,US);
B62M3/00 (EP,US);
Y10S428/911 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/41] | B05D7/02, B05D7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/41] | Title | German: | Beschitete Bauteile | [2004/41] | English: | Coated parts | [2004/41] | French: | Eléments revêtus | [2004/41] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/41] | 26.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/50] | 21.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/50] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00304829.5 / EP1059123 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5064695 (HOTTA KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-5 * column 1, line 6 - line 15 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US5693710 (SRINIVASAN SACHIT [US], et al) [A] 1,3-5 * column 1, line 13 - line 25 ** claim 1 *; | [PX]US5955545 (MARUTANI YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [PX] 1,3-5 * column 1, line 6 - line 12 * * claim 1 * * column 1, line 35 - line 39 * * column 21, line 52 - column 22, line 3; example 1 *; | [E]WO0041530 (DU PONT [US], et al) [E] 1,3-5 * page 1, line 29 - line 32 * * page 6, line 19 - line 21 * * page 2, line 3 * * page 2, line 16 - line 17 * * page 2, line 29 - line 31 * * page 2, line 37 - line 38 * * claims 1,2,6,12 * * page 9, line 16 - line 20 * |