EP1505604 - Actuator having absorption filter and disk drive having the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shin, Sang-chul 207-1301 Jugong Apartment 920-2 Osan-dong Osan-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2005/06] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04016588.8 | 14.07.2004 | [2005/06] | Priority number, date | KR20030054784 | 07.08.2003 Original published format: KR 2003054784 | [2005/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1505604 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1505604 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | [2007/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1505604 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11B33/14, G11B25/04, G11B21/02, G11B5/54, G11B5/48 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
G11B5/48 (EP,US);
G11B21/21 (KR);
G11B33/146 (EP,US);
G11B25/043 (EP,US);
G11B33/1446 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2008/18] |
Former [2005/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Positionieranordnung mit Aufsaugungsfilter und Plattenantrieb mit einer solchen Anordnung | [2005/06] | English: | Actuator having absorption filter and disk drive having the same | [2005/06] | French: | Positionneur avec filtre d'absorption et entraînement de disque équipé d'un tel positionneur | [2005/06] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 23.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5418666 (MIHARA TAKAHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1,8,15 * column 4, lines 40-45; figures 1,5 *; | [DA]JP2001076478 (HITACHI LTD) [DA] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]US6208484 (VOIGHTS RONALD L [US]) [A] 1,8,15* column 2, line 57 - column 5, line 23; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US6362937 (GIBBS ROBERT M [US], et al) [A] 1,8,15 * column 4, lines 31-50; figure 1 * | by applicant | US5418666 | US6208484 | US6362937 |