EP1504963 - Roof carrier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCAMBIA Industrial Developments Aktiengesellschaft In der Ballota 2a 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states SCAMBIA INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENTS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT In der Ballota 2a 9494 Schaan / LI | ||
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states ORIS FAHRZEUGTEILE HANS RIEHLE GmbH Im Bornrain 2 71696 Möglingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dreher, Martin Karlstrasse 33 71696 Möglingen / DE | 02 /
Schierle, Horst Friedrichstrasse 1/1 71691 Freiberg / DE | 03 /
Neumann, Peter Burgstrasse 18/1 71720 Oberstenfeld / DE | 04 /
Rimmelspacher, Bernhard Gartenstrasse 11 76287 Rheinstetten / DE | 05 /
Riehle, Jörg Lehenstrasse 37 71679 Asperg / DE | [2005/06] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04016643.1 | 15.07.2004 | [2005/06] | Priority number, date | DE2003137540 | 06.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10337540 | [2005/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1504963 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60R9/058 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
B60R9/058 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/06] | Title | German: | Dachlastenträger | [2005/06] | English: | Roof carrier | [2005/06] | French: | Galerie de toit | [2005/06] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 01.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/31] | 09.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1036903 (RIVIERE) [X] 1,5,6,13,23 * the whole document *; | [X]CH555756 (BARAVALLE UGO) [X] 1,15-20 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2710222 (JACK BUSCH GMBH & CO KG); | [A]DE2932874 (FREY DIETER); | [A]EP0091889 (THULE IND AB [SE]); | [A]FR2534203 (VERNIER ALAIN [FR]); | [X]DE19959940 (THULE IND AB [SE]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * |