EP1466559 - Methods and apparatus for cardiac imaging with conventional computed tomography [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsieh, Jiang 19970 West Keswick Court Brookfield Wisconsin 53045 / US | 02 /
Shen, Yun City Hous 5-1043 4-7-5,Asahigaoka Hino-shi Tokyo 191 / JP | 03 /
Woodford, Mark 709 Larchmont Drive Waukesha Wisconsin 53186 / JP | 04 /
Pan, Tin-Su 2710 Fieldside Court Brookfield Wisconsin 53005 / US | 05 /
Woloschek, Steven John 4695 Highview Drive Franklin Wisconsin 53132 / US | 06 /
Acharya, Kishore 1325 Ridgeway Road Brookfield Wisconsin 53005 / US | [2005/10] |
Former [2005/09] | 01 /
Hsieh, Jiang 19970 West Keswick Court Brookfield Wisconsin 53045 / US | ||
02 /
Shen, Yun City Hous 5-1043 4-7-5,Asahigaoka Hino-shi Tokyo 191 / JP | |||
03 /
Woodford, Mark 1029 Oxford Road Waukesha Wisconsin 53188 / JP | |||
04 /
Pan, Tin-Su 2710 Fieldside Court Brookfield Wisconsin 53005 / US | |||
05 /
Woloschek, Steven John 4695 Highview Drive Franklin Wisconsin 53132 / US | |||
06 /
Acharya, Kishore 1325 Ridgeway Road Brookfield Wisconsin 53005 / US | |||
Former [2004/42] | 01 /
Hsieh, Jiang 19970 West Keswick Court Brookfield Wisconsin 53045 / US | ||
02 /
Shen, Yun City Hous 5-1043 Hino-shi Tokyo 191 / JP | |||
03 /
Woodford, Mark 1029 Oxford Road Waukesha Wisconsin 53188 / JP | |||
04 /
Pan, Tin-Su 2710 Fieldside Court Brookfield Wisconsin 53005 / US | |||
05 /
Woloschek, Steven John 4695 Highview Drive Franklin Wisconsin 53132 / US | |||
06 /
Acharya, Kishore 1325 Ridgeway Road Brookfield Wisconsin 53005 / US | Representative(s) | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al London Patent Operation, General Electric International, Inc., 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04016712.4 | 29.09.2000 | [2004/42] | Priority number, date | US19990410157 | 30.09.1999 Original published format: US 410157 | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1466559 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1466559 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | [2005/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1466559 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00, A61B6/03 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
A61B6/541 (EP,US);
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/503 (EP,US);
A61B6/027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2004/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Abbildung des Herzens mit konventioneller Computer-Tomographie | [2004/42] | English: | Methods and apparatus for cardiac imaging with conventional computed tomography | [2004/42] | French: | Procédés et appareil d'imagerie cardiaque par tomographie classique assistée par ordinateur | [2004/42] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 28.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00308616.2 / EP1090586 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4182311 (HARELL GEORGE S [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 9, line 54 - column 10, line 7 * * column 5, line 39 - column 9, line 24; tables 1-4 *; | [X]US4641328 (FUJISE MASAKUNI [JP]) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 24 - column 5, line 24 *; | [X]US4868747 (MORI ISSEI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 23 * * column 3, line 4 - column 5, line 3; tables 1-3,5,9 *; | [A]US5271055 (HSIEH JIANG [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 51; tables 1-3 *; | [X]US5383231 (YAMAGISHI ICHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 20 * * column 4, line 6 - column 5, line 36; table 2 *; | [A]US5396418 (HEUSCHER DOMINIC J [US]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]US5818896 (HSIEH JIANG [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9907283 (ELSCINT LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 12, paragraph 2 *; | [X]DE19740214 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 3 - column 3, line 45; tables 1,2 * |