EP1475235 - Printer, recording medium for storing print control programs, and printing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2004/46] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashi, Toshihiro Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano / JP | 02 /
Matsuzawa, Yoshihiko Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano / JP | [2004/46] | Representative(s) | Marchitelli, Mauro Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Marchitelli, Mauro c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2004/46] | Marchitelli, Mauro c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 04016811.4 | 25.08.1999 | [2004/46] | Priority number, date | JP19980242351 | 27.08.1998 Original published format: JP 24235198 | JP19980305882 | 27.10.1998 Original published format: JP 30588298 | JP19990198990 | 13.07.1999 Original published format: JP 19899099 | [2004/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1475235 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1475235 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B41J13/12, B41J2/045 | [2004/46] | CPC: |
B41J2/04508 (EP,US);
B41J11/20 (EP,US);
B41J13/12 (EP,US);
B41J2/04573 (EP,US);
B41J2/04581 (EP,US);
B41J2/2128 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/46] | Title | German: | Drucker, Speichermedium für das Drucksteuerprogramm und Druckverfahren | [2004/46] | English: | Printer, recording medium for storing print control programs, and printing method | [2004/46] | French: | Imprimante, medium de stockage pour des programmes de commande d'impression et méthode d'impression | [2004/46] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/46] | 15.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99116619.0 / EP0982146 | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.09.2006 | BE | 20.09.2006 | CH | 20.09.2006 | CY | 20.09.2006 | FI | 20.09.2006 | LI | 20.09.2006 | NL | 20.09.2006 | DK | 20.12.2006 | SE | 20.12.2006 | GR | 21.12.2006 | ES | 31.12.2006 | PT | 12.03.2007 | [2009/40] |
Former [2008/21] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
BE | 20.09.2006 | ||
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 20.09.2006 | |
CH | 20.09.2006 | ||
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | CH | 20.09.2006 | |
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | CH | 20.09.2006 | |
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | CH | 20.09.2006 | |
FI | 20.09.2006 | ||
LI | 20.09.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04151252 ; | [A]JPS6018377 ; | [A]US4847638 (MORIYAMA JIRO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 33 - line 53 * * column 2, line 48 - line 66 * * column 3, line 38 - line 57 * * column 4, line 3 - line 12 *; | [A]EP0631257 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-10 * figures 60A,60B ** column 48, line 36 - column 49, line 33 *; | [PA]JPH1148468 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [PA] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0014] * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920911), vol. 016, no. 438, Database accession no. (M - 1309), & JP04151252 A 19920525 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850614), vol. 009, no. 139, Database accession no. (M - 387), & JP60018377 A 19850130 (OKI DENKI KOGYO KK) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |