EP1511359 - Circuit arrangement for an electrical appliance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schott AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [2005/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schaupert, Kurt, Dr. Rüdesheimerstrasse 46 65719 Hofheim / DE | 02 /
Zenker, Thomas, Dr. Tresterweg 11 55268 Nieder Olm / DE | 03 /
Ohl, Gerold Bahnhofstrasse 4 55286 Sulzheim / DE | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Fleck, Hermann-Josef Jeck, Fleck & partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Fleck, Hermann-Josef, Dr.-Ing. Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 04016871.8 | 16.07.2004 | [2005/09] | Priority number, date | DE20031039410 | 27.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10339410 | [2005/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1511359 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1511359 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/00 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
H05B1/0252 (EP,US);
H05B3/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/24] |
Former [2005/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung für ein Elektrogerät | [2005/09] | English: | Circuit arrangement for an electrical appliance | [2005/09] | French: | Arrangement de circuit pour un appareil électrique | [2005/09] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 04.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/15] | 20.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1525016 (SEFTON P) [X] 1* the whole document *; | [X]DE3526992 (WEISS HANS DIPL ING FH [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]EP0374868 (KLASCHKA IND ELEKTRONIK [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]EP0687131 (EGO ELEKTRO BLANC & FISCHER [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-12 * column 1, lines 15-28 * * column 3, lines 11-19 * * column 3, lines 33-40 * * column 4, lines 15-23; figures 1-8 *; | [X]DE19534872 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]DE29701901U (KUHN RALF [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1001505 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * |