EP1500926 - Method for the compensation of aging of a sensor for measuring a gas concentration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [2005/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Altendorf, Frank Am Oberhof 31 51061 Köln / DE | 02 /
Ernst, Thomas Reinshagener Strasse 106 42857 Remscheid / DE | 03 /
Fassbender, Hubert Albrecht-Dürer Strasse 51 41352 Korschenbroich / DE | 04 /
Grüneberg, Richard von-Behring-Strasse 21 42283 Wuppertal / DE | 05 /
Klepka, Michael Mühlenfeld 58 42369 Wuppertal / DE | 06 /
Richter, Klaus Paulstrasse 11 42857 Remscheid / DE | [2005/04] | Representative(s) | Hocker, Thomas Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/04] | Hocker, Thomas Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | Application number, filing date | 04016940.1 | 19.07.2004 | [2005/04] | Priority number, date | AT20030001134 | 21.07.2003 Original published format: AT 11342003 | [2005/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1500926 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1500926 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/416 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
G01N33/0006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Kompensation der Alterung eines Sensors zur Erfassung einer Gaskonzentration | [2005/04] | English: | Method for the compensation of aging of a sensor for measuring a gas concentration | [2005/04] | French: | Méthode pour la compensation du processus de vieillissement d'un capteur pour mesurer la concentration de gaz | [2005/04] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 10.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.08.2009 | EE | 19.08.2009 | FI | 19.08.2009 | RO | 19.08.2009 | SI | 19.08.2009 | TR | 19.08.2009 | BG | 19.11.2009 | GR | 20.11.2009 | HU | 20.02.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
HU | 20.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
RO | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
EE | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
BG | 19.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 19.08.2009 | |
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 19.08.2009 | |
SI | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 19.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0453062 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 1 ** column 13, line 7 - line 51; figure 4 *; | [X]DE19522347 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 3, line 4 - line 19; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19516974 (LANDIS & GYR TECH INNOVAT [CH]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * column 1, line 38 - line 46; figure 1; claim 1 * | Examination | DE4344961 | DE19729350 |