EP1510589 - Bearing's component, heat treatment method thereof, heat treatment apparatus, and rolling bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTN Corporation 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states NTN Corporation 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohki, Chikara NTN Corporation 3066,Aza Oyumida, Oaza Higashikata Kuwana-shi, Mie / JP | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/11] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/09] | Grosse, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Grosse, Bockhorni & Schumacher, Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04016980.7 | 19.07.2004 | [2005/09] | Priority number, date | JP20030307281 | 29.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003307281 | [2005/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1510589 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C21D1/78, C21D9/36, C23C8/32, C23C8/80, F16C33/30 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
C23C8/32 (EP,US);
C21D1/78 (EP,US);
C21D9/40 (EP,US);
C23C8/80 (EP,US);
C21D1/18 (EP,US);
C21D9/36 (EP,US);
F16C2240/90 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2005/47] |
Former [2005/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lagerbauteil, dessen Wärmebehandlungsverfahren und -Vorrichtung, und Wälzlager | [2005/09] | English: | Bearing's component, heat treatment method thereof, heat treatment apparatus, and rolling bearing | [2005/09] | French: | Elément de palier, procédé et disposif de son traitement thermique et palier à roulement | [2005/09] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 03.09.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.01.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/13] | 18.11.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.12.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/13] | Appeal following examination | 07.01.2010 | Appeal received No. T0612/10 | 01.03.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.12.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 13.12.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.12.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.10.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2003226919 ; | [X]DE4204982 (HOECHSTADTER MASCHINENFABRIK S [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-16 * the whole document *; | [X]US5352303 (MURAKAMI YASUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0626468 (SKF IND TRADING & DEV [NL]); | [A]EP0723034 (DOWA MINING CO [JP]) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003123769 (OHKI CHIKARA [JP]) [X] 1-16 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2003226919 A 20030815 (NTN CORP) [X] 11 * abstract * |