EP1618900 - Superabsorbent polymers comprising direct covalent bonds between polymer chain segments and methods of making them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flohr, Andreas Am Eichbühel 1 61476 Kronberg / DE | [2006/04] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Uwe T., et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H., et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 04017070.6 | 20.07.2004 | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1618900 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/60 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
A61L15/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/04] | Title | German: | Superabsorbierende Polymere mit direkten kovalenten Bindungen zwischen den Polymerkettensegmenten | [2006/04] | English: | Superabsorbent polymers comprising direct covalent bonds between polymer chain segments and methods of making them | [2006/04] | French: | Polymères superabsorbants comprenant des liaisons covalentes directes entre les segments des chaînes polymériques | [2006/04] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 07.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/42] | 29.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH01292103 ; | [DX]EP0509708 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [DX] 1-4,6,17 * page 2, line 1 - line 33 * * page 3, line 23 - line 51 * * page 4, line 13 - line 45 * * claims 1,5 *; | [X]US5883158 (NAMBU HIROMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6,17 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 35 * * column 4, line 3 - line 26 * * example 1 *; | [X]WO9955393 (SCA HYGIENE PROD AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,17 * page 2, line 24 - line 28 * * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 13 * * page 6, line 2 - line 3 * * page 6, line 20 - line 31 * * claims 1,2,4 *; | [X]US6579958 (WILSON LARRY R [US]) [X] 1-4,6,17 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 31 * * column 4, line 6 - line 30 * * column 5, line 1 - line 51 * * column 6, line 16 - line 28 *; | [E]EP1504771 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [E] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1504772 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [E] 1-18* the whole document *; | [E]EP1506788 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [E] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 02, Database accession no. 1990-011701, XP002293849 & JPH01292103 A 19891124 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO LTD) [X] 9-11,13-15,18 * abstract * |