EP1516809 - Drive train and vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merkle, Wolfgang Jahnstrasse 18 89567 Sontheim / DE | [2005/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/12] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 04017154.8 | 21.07.2004 | [2005/12] | Priority number, date | DE2003143921 | 19.09.2003 Original published format: DE 10343921 | DE2003154804 | 21.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10354804 | [2005/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1516809 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1516809 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B62M7/02, B62K13/04, B62K5/00 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
B62K5/01 (EP);
B62K13/04 (EP);
B62K5/027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2007/04] |
Former [2005/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Antriebsstrang und Fahrzeug | [2005/12] | English: | Drive train and vehicle | [2005/12] | French: | Transmission et véhicule | [2005/12] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 18.11.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/31] | 22.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.01.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4836324 (MORITA MASATAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract *; | [X]DE20006252U (AUTOMARKT IM ODENWALD GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,14-19 * the whole document *; | [X]US6286619 (UCHIYAMA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE20116103U (LIPPERT GERHARD [DE]) [A] 1-5,16,17,19* abstract *; | [X]US2002007978 (SUZUKI TAKEHITO [JP]) [X] 1-5 * abstract *; | [X]US2002144852 (SHIMIZU KATSUHISA [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]US6547027 (KALHOK DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract * |