EP1500950 - Parking-assist device and reversing-assist device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2014/49] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2005/04] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Endo, Tomohiko c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
Satonaka, Hisashi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
Kubota, Yuichi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
Matsui, Akira c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 05 /
Iwakiri, Hideyuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 06 /
Sugiyama, Toru c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 07 /
Kawakami, Seiji c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 08 /
Iwazaki, Katsuhiko c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 09 /
Kataoka, Hiroaki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 10 /
Tanaka, Yuu c/o Intellectual Property Department AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome, Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 11 /
Iwata, Yoshifumi c/o Intellectual Property Department AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome, Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [2014/48] |
Former [2005/04] | 01 /
Endo, Tomohiko c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
Satonaka, Hisashi c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
03 /
Kubota, Yuichi c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
04 /
Matsui, Akira c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
05 /
Iwakiri, Hideyuki c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
06 /
Sugiyama, Toru c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
07 /
Kawakami, Seiji c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
08 /
Iwazaki, Katsuhiko c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
09 /
Kataoka, Hiroaki c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
10 /
Tanaka, Yuu Aisin Seiki KK Int. Prop. Dpmt. 2-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | |||
11 /
Iwata, Yoshifumi Aisin Seiki KK Int. Prop. Dpmt. 2-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2005/04] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 04017192.8 | 21.07.2004 | [2005/04] | Priority number, date | JP20030278533 | 23.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003278533 | [2005/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1500950 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1500950 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1500950 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/16, B60Q1/48, G05D1/02, B62D15/02 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
G01S5/16 (EP,US);
B62D15/0275 (EP,US);
B62D15/028 (EP,US);
B62D15/0285 (EP,US);
B60T2201/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/04] | G01S5/16, B60Q1/48, G05D1/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/34] |
Former [2005/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hilfsgerät zum Einparken und Rückwärtsfahren | [2005/04] | English: | Parking-assist device and reversing-assist device | [2005/04] | French: | Dispositif d'assistance de véhicule pour parcage et en marche arrière | [2014/48] |
Former [2005/04] | Dispostif d'assistance de véhicule pour parcage et en marche arrière | Examination procedure | 18.08.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 07.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 21.07.2015 | FR | 31.07.2015 | [2016/25] |
Former [2016/23] | GB | 21.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5957232 (SHIMIZU YASUO [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 28 *; | [XY]EP1065642 (FUJITSU TEN LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0079] , [0124] - [0126] - [0174] , [0182] , [0183] , [0258] - [0266] - [0309] , [0311] , [0313] * * figures 4-8,19-22 * [Y] 2; | [A]EP1327559 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [DPA]EP1332948 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [DPA] 1-3* the whole document * | by applicant | JP1002014794 | JPH11208420 | JP2003212073 |