EP1619282 - Needle for a stitchforming system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Groz-Beckert KG Parkweg 2 72458 Albstadt / DE | [2006/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simmendinger, Roland Sägeweg 8 72469 Strassberg / DE | 02 /
Wiedenhöfer, Kurt Hugo-Bertsch-Strasse 50 72459 Albstadt / DE | 03 /
Sauter, Manfred Mühlweg 22 72510 Stetten a.k.M.-Storzingen / DE | [2006/04] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Patentanwälte Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a. N. / DE | Application number, filing date | 04017486.4 | 23.07.2004 | [2006/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1619282 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1619282 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D04B35/04, D04B35/06 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
D04B35/06 (EP,US);
D04B35/04 (EP,KR,US);
D05B85/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, TR [2006/39] |
Former [2006/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Nadel für ein maschenbildendes System | [2006/04] | English: | Needle for a stitchforming system | [2006/04] | French: | Aiguille pour un système formant des mailles | [2006/04] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2004 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 25.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.11.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.09.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1391043 (WORTH BURSON WILSON) [X] 1-6* page 1, line 75 - page 2, line 98; figures 1-3; claim 7 *; | [X]DE2909963 (HOFMANN ULRICH) [X] 1-7,10 * page 18, line 7 - page 19, line 25; figures 1-7,20-25; claims 2,5,10 * |