EP1575006 - Cup feeder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F.A.S. International S.p.A. Via Lago di Vico, 60 36015 Schio (Vicenza) / IT | [2005/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mestek, Claudio Viale Brianza, 33 20127 Milano / IT | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Perani, Aurelio, et al Perani & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | Perani, Aurelio, et al Perani Mezzanotte & Partners Piazza San Babila 5 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2005/44] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati S.p.A. Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2005/37] | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano & Associati, Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 04017623.2 | 26.07.2004 | [2005/37] | Priority number, date | IT2004VR00030 | 05.03.2004 Original published format: IT vr20040030 | [2005/37] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1575006 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G07F13/10, B65G59/10 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
G07F13/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/22] |
Former [2005/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorschubvorrichtung für Näpfe | [2005/37] | English: | Cup feeder | [2005/37] | French: | Dispositif pour avancer des godets | [2005/37] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 15.03.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.07.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/27] | 08.02.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.02.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.04.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3120324 (AMBERG STEPHAN W, et al) [X] 1-11 * figures 8,11-13 * * column 11, line 38 - column 18, line 65 *; | [XA]US4418837 (KONTZ ROBERT F [US]) [X] 1-3,6 * figures 1,6 * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 46 *[A] 4,5,7-11; | [X]US4426017 (FICKEN LEONARD A [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]US5518149 (LOTSPEICH JOSEPH A [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * the whole document * |