EP1621362 - A stationery accessory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acco UK Limited Gatehouse Road Aylesbury Buckinghamshire HP19 8DT / GB | [2006/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Twitchett, Mark Jonathan 148 Cock Lane, High Wycombe Bucks HP13 7EA / GB | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Parry, Simon James Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Parry, Simon James Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/05] | Parry, Simon James Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04018041.6 | 29.07.2004 | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1621362 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B42F1/00, B42F3/00 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
B42F1/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Papierwarenzubehör | [2006/05] | English: | A stationery accessory | [2006/05] | French: | Accessoire de papeterie | [2006/05] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 13.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0085547 (RANDOLPH RICHARD) [X] 1-5 * page 4, line 1 - page 9, line 7; figure - *; | [X]EP0158002 (LORBER KURT) [X] 1-5 * page 7, line 1 - page 10, line 18; figure - *; | [A]US2002088098 (BOULEY ROGER R [US]) [A] 1-21* the whole document * |