EP1503609 - Radio network controller and radio communications method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.2013 [2013/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/21] |
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moon, Sung Uk, Int. Prop. Dpt., NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ishii, Minami, Int. Prop. Dpt., NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Takehiro, Int.Prop.Dpt., NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2012/22] |
Former [2005/05] | 01 /
Moon, Sung Uk, Int. Prop. Dpt., NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Ishii, Minami, Int. Prop. Dpt., NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Nakamura, Takehiro, Int.Prop.Dpt., NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/05] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04018169.5 | 30.07.2004 | [2005/05] | Priority number, date | JP20030204843 | 31.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003204843 | [2005/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1503609 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1503609 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | [2008/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1503609 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/06, // H04W60/02, H04W88/12 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
H04W4/06 (EP,KR,US);
H04W88/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04W60/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04W60/04 (KR);
H04W76/40 (EP,KR,US);
H04W8/06 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/05] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/50] |
Former [2005/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Funknetzsteuerungseinheit und Funkkommunikationsverfahren | [2005/05] | English: | Radio network controller and radio communications method | [2005/05] | French: | Contrôleur de réseau radio et procédé de radiocommunication | [2005/05] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 03.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03019828 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-4 * page 13, line 2 - page 13, line 10 * * page 14, line 12 - page 14, line 15 * * page 21, line 25 - page 21, line 32 *; | [A]WO03058866 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-4 * page 11, line 15 - page 11, line 19 * * page 12, line 11 - page 12, line 15 * * page 15, line 12 - page 15, line 16 * * page 18, line 1 - page 18, line 22 ** page 27, paragraph 37 - page 27, paragraph 40 *; | [X] - NORTEL NETWORKS/ SAMSUNG, "MBMS Scenarios - UE Link Handling", 3GPP TSG-RAN2/RAN3 #35 MEETING, (20030403), pages 1 - 7, XP002292826 [X] 1-4 * page 1, line 8 - page 1, line 14 * * page 1, line 25 - page 1, line 30 * * page 2, line 1 - page 2, line 12 * * page 2, line 20 - page 2, line 25 * * page 3, line 1 - page 3, line 5 * * page 4, line 13 - page 4, line 21 * * page 5, line 1 - page 5, line 9 * * page 7, line 2 - page 7, line 8 * | [X] - "MBMS Signalling Flows for UEs in Idle Mode", TSG-RAN WG2 MEETING #33, XX, XX, (20021115), pages 1 - 3, XP002288252 [X] 1-4 * page 1, line 9 - page 1, line 25 * * page 2, line 1 - page 2, line 5 * | [A] - "3GPP TS 25.346 V2.0.0 (2003-06) 3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Introduction of the Multimedia Broadcast Multicast Service (MBMS) in the Radio Access Network (Stage-2); (Release 6)", SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS - FRANCE, (200306), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/html-info/25346.htm, (20080204), XP002468474 [A] 1-4 * page 7, paragraph 5.1.1 * * page 8, paragraph 5.1.3 - page 8, paragraph 5.1.4 * * page 14, paragraph 7.1.1 * * page 15, paragraph 7.1.2 * |