EP1508364 - Agitation mixer, pasteurizer, and cleaning device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reika Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 2020-10, Oaza Kanou Kou, Kiyotake-Cho Miyazaki-Gun Miyazaki 889-1605 / JP | [2006/40] |
Former [2005/08] | For all designated states Reika Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 2020-10, Oaza Kanou Kou, Kiyotake-Cho Miyazaki-Gun, Miyazaki 889-1605 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taniguchi, Toru, c/o Reika Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 2020-10, Oaza Kanou Kou Kiyotake-cho Miyazaki-gun Miyazaki 889-1605 / JP | [2005/08] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/08] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04018361.8 | 03.08.2004 | [2005/08] | Priority number, date | JP20030292785 | 13.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003292785 | [2005/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1508364 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1508364 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01F11/00 | [2005/08] | CPC: |
A61L2/07 (EP,US);
B01F23/23 (EP,US);
B01F31/441 (EP,US);
B01F31/57 (EP,US);
B01J19/1806 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00777 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00779 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/45] |
Former [2005/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rührmischer, Pasteurisator, und Reinigungsvorrichtung | [2005/08] | English: | Agitation mixer, pasteurizer, and cleaning device | [2005/08] | French: | Mélangeur agitateur, pasteurisateur et dispositif de nettoyage | [2005/08] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 20.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.09.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB689974 (STANDARD OIL DEV CO) [X] 1,2 * page 4, line 100 - page 5, line 100; figures 1-3 * [Y] 4,6,7; | [X]FR1195160 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE) [X] 1 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 2, paragraph 3; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]FR1302176 (BASF AG) [X] 1 * page 2, paragraph 2; figures 1,2a * [Y] 4; | [X]US4983045 (TANIGUCHI TORU [JP]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 30; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2001000327 (ZITTEL DAVID R [US], et al) [Y] 6 * abstract *; | [Y]US2003070754 (FRANCIS EVAN [CA], et al) [Y] 7* abstract * |