EP1508288 - Refrigerated display with a novel refrigerated air curtain [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation One Carrier Place Farmington, CT 06034 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | For all designated states Carrier Corporation One Carrier Place Farmington, CT 06034 / US | ||
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states Linde Kältetechnik GmbH Sürther Hauptstrasse 173 50999 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2005/08] | For all designated states Linde Kältetechnik GmbH & Co.KG Sürther Hauptstrasse 173 50999 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Möller, Bernhard Carlo-Mierendorff-Strasse 3 65468 Trebur / DE | 02 /
Schuster, Markus Windthorststrasse 7 55131 Mainz / DE | 03 /
Spettmann, Ines Pestalozzistrasse 30 63225 Langen / DE | [2005/08] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/46] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/08] | Zahn, Christoph, et al Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 04018591.0 | 05.08.2004 | [2005/08] | Priority number, date | DE2003138672 | 22.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10338672 | [2005/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1508288 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1508288 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A47F3/04 | [2005/08] | CPC: |
A47F3/0447 (EP);
A47F2003/046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/08] | Title | German: | Kühlregal mit neuartigem Kühlluftschleier | [2005/08] | English: | Refrigerated display with a novel refrigerated air curtain | [2005/08] | French: | Présentoir réfrigéré comprenant un rideau d'air froid de type nouveau | [2005/08] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 13.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2007 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.08.2004 | BG | 17.07.2013 | CY | 17.07.2013 | CZ | 17.07.2013 | DK | 17.07.2013 | EE | 17.07.2013 | FI | 17.07.2013 | IT | 17.07.2013 | MC | 17.07.2013 | PL | 17.07.2013 | RO | 17.07.2013 | SE | 17.07.2013 | SI | 17.07.2013 | SK | 17.07.2013 | TR | 17.07.2013 | AT | 05.08.2013 | IE | 05.08.2013 | LU | 05.08.2013 | BE | 31.08.2013 | CH | 31.08.2013 | LI | 31.08.2013 | GR | 18.10.2013 | ES | 28.10.2013 | PT | 18.11.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
TR | 17.07.2013 | ||
AT | 05.08.2013 | ||
IE | 05.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
AT | 05.08.2013 | ||
IE | 05.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
IE | 05.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | SE | 17.07.2013 | |
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | PT | 18.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1282235 (HUSSMANN REFRIGERATOR CO) [X] 1-6 * page 3, column L, line 30 - column R, line 48; figures 1,2 *; | [X]FR84017E (HUSSMANN REFRIGERATOR CO) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR2690825 (MC INTERNATIONAL [FR]) [Y] 1-6 * figure 2; claims 1-6 *; | [DY]DE20119347U (LINDE AG [DE]) [DY] 1-6* the whole document * | by applicant | DE29819057U | DE20119347U |