EP1624357 - Voltage regulator having inverse adaptive control means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanopower Solution Co., Ltd. HIB Otsuka-Bldg. 5F 13-17, Kita-Otsuka 1-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 170-0004 / JP | [2006/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akita, Shinichi, c/o Nanopower Solutions, Inc. 6F Ikebukuro 2-Chome Bldg. 2-14-2 Ikebukuro Toshima-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/23] |
Former [2006/06] | 01 /
Akita, Shinichi, c/o Nanopower Solution Co. Ltd. HIB Otsuka-Bldg. 5F 13-17 Kita-Otsuka 1-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 170-0004 / JP | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/06] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04018702.3 | 06.08.2004 | [2006/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1624357 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/575 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
G05F1/575 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FI, FR, GB [2006/41] |
Former [2006/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Spannungsregler mit adaptiven Umkehrregelungsmitteln | [2006/06] | English: | Voltage regulator having inverse adaptive control means | [2006/06] | French: | Régulateur de tension avec moyens de commande inverse adaptatives | [2006/06] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 09.08.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.12.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/52] | 03.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.09.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3870896 (KIKO FREDERICK) [X] 2 * column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 33; figures 1,2 * [A] 1; | [XA]US4315207 (APFEL RUSSELL J) [X] 2 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 14 * * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 50; figure 2 * [A] 1; | [A]US4535276 (YOKOBORI NOBUYOSHI [JP]) [A] 1* column 4, line 30 - column 5, line 41; figure 1 *; | [XA]US5055767 (NELSON CARL T [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 32 - column 6, line 4; figures 1,2 * [A] 2; | [A]US5408173 (KNAPP HERBERT C [US]) [A] 2 * column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 68; figure 1 * |