EP1508579 - Modified polyolefin waxes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2006/11] |
Former [2005/08] | For all designated states Clariant GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hohner, Gerd, Dr. Adolf-von-Bayer-Strasse 26 86368 Gersthofen / DE | [2005/08] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2006/11] |
Former [2005/08] | Mikulecky, Klaus, et al Clariant Service GmbH Patente, Marken, Lizenzen Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach/Ts. / DE | Application number, filing date | 04018897.1 | 10.08.2004 | [2005/08] | Priority number, date | DE2003138344 | 21.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10338344 | [2005/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1508579 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08F255/00, C09J151/06, C09J191/06, // (C08F255/00, 230:08) | [2005/08] | CPC: |
C08F255/00 (EP,US);
C09J151/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2005/45] |
Former [2005/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Modifizierte Polyolefinwachse | [2005/08] | English: | Modified polyolefin waxes | [2005/08] | French: | Cires de polyoléfine modifiées | [2005/08] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/42] | 21.08.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPS54145785 [ ]; | JPH0288610 [ ]; | JPS63282751 [ ] (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO); | [X]WO9207009 (BESHAY ALPHONS D [CA]) [X] 1-14 * example 10; claims 1-8,11-15,17,18; tables 9,10 * * page 3, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 4 * * page 6, paragraph 4 *; | [A]EP0803530 (SENTINEL PRODUCTS CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * claims 1-6,17-23 *; | [AD]EP0827994 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [AD] 1-14 * example 1; claims 1-5,8,9 * * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 19 * * page 3, line 41 - page 4, line 4 *; | [X] - INAGAKI, HAJIME ET AL, "Silane-modified wax", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (19840512), Database accession no. 92:111746, URL: STN, XP002310195 [X] 1-14 * abstract * | [A] - TANAKA, MUTSUHIRO ET AL, "Preparation of silane-modified polyolefins", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (19900916), Database accession no. 113:99032, URL: STN, XP002310196 [A] 1-14 * abstract * | [A] - HORIE, SHINJI ET AL, "Electrophotographic toners containing wax modified by grafting with ethylenic silane compounds", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (19890526), Database accession no. 110:202860, URL: STN, XP002310197 [A] 1-11 * abstract * | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800129), vol. 0040, no. 12, Database accession no. (C - 071), & JP54145785 A 19791114 (MITSUI PETROCHEM IND LTD) [ ] * abstract * | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900620), vol. 0142, no. 84, Database accession no. (C - 0730), & JP02088610 A 19900328 (MITSUI PETROCHEM IND LTD) [ ] * abstract * |