EP1475394 - Olefin polymerization process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnson, Lynda Kaye 707 Burnley Road Wilmington, Delaware 19083 / US | 02 /
Feldman, Jerald 4403 Channing Road Wilmington, Delaware 19802 / US | 03 /
Kreutzer, Kristina Ann Apartment 2C, 4 Doe Run Court Wilmington, Delaware 19808-2059 / US | 04 /
McLain, Stephan James 202 Old Mill Lane Wilmington, Delaware 19803-4922 / US | 05 /
Bennet, Alison Margaret Anne 507 Falkirk Road Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US | 06 /
Coughlin, Edward Bryan 74 Overlook Drive Amherst, Massachusetts 01002 / US | 07 /
Donald, Dennis Scott P.O. Box 321 Mendenhall, Pennsylvania 19357-0321 / US | 08 /
Nelson, Lissa Taka Jennings Apartment H-8, 3131 Meetinghouse Road Boothwyn, Pennsylvania 19061 / US | 09 /
Parthasarathy, Anju 1562 Pottstown Pike Glenmoore, Pennsylvania 19343-9614 / US | 10 /
Shen, Xing 4043D Miramar Street La Jolla, California 92037 / US | 11 /
Tam, Wilson 3781 Brookcroft Lane Boothwyn, Pennsylvania 19061-1817 / US | 12 /
Wang, Yueli 238 Presidential drive Nr. B Wilmington, Delaware 19807 / US | [2005/09] |
Former [2004/46] | 01 /
Johnson, Lynda Kaye Apartment 5B2, 402 Foulk Road Wilmington, Delaware 19083 / US | ||
02 /
Feldman, Jerald 16 Cinnamon Drive Hockessin, Delaware 19707-1349 / US | |||
03 /
Kreutzer, Kristina Ann Apartment 2C, 4 Doe Run Court Wilmington, Delaware 19808-2059 / US | |||
04 /
McLain, Stephan James 202 Old Mill Lane Wilmington, Delaware 19803-4922 / US | |||
05 /
Bennet, Alison Margaret Anne 507 Falkirk Road Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US | |||
06 /
Coughlin, Edward Bryan Apartment E, 2227 Prior Road Wilmington, Delaware 19809-1154 / US | |||
07 /
Donald, Dennis Scott P.O. Box 321 Mendenhall, Pennsylvania 19357-0321 / US | |||
08 /
Nelson, Lissa Taka Jennings Apartment H-8, 3131 Meetinghouse Road Boothwyn, Pennsylvania 19061 / US | |||
09 /
Parthasarathy, Anju 1562 Pottstown Pike Glenmoore, Pennsylvania 19343-9614 / US | |||
10 /
Shen, Xing 4043D Miramar Street La Jolla, California 92037 / US | |||
11 /
Tam, Wilson 3781 Brookcroft Lane Boothwyn, Pennsylvania 19061-1817 / US | |||
12 /
Wang, Yueli 238 Presidential drive Nr. B Wilmington, Delaware 19807 / US | Representative(s) | Towler, Philip Dean Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Towler, Philip Dean Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2004/46] | Towler, Philip Dean Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04019017.5 | 28.06.1996 | [2004/46] | Priority number, date | US19950000747P | 30.06.1995 Original published format: US 747 P | US19960671392 | 27.06.1996 Original published format: US 671392 | [2004/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1475394 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1475394 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | [2005/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/02, C08F12/04, C08F32/04, C08F4/70 | [2004/46] | CPC: |
C08F32/08 (EP,US);
C08F10/02 (EP,KR,US);
C07F15/04 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F12/04 (KR);
C08F12/08 (EP,US);
C08F32/04 (KR);
C08F4/70 (KR);
C08F110/02 (EP,US);
C08F210/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/7006 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/7008 (EP,US);
C08F10/00, C08F4/7009 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/7018 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/44] |
Former [2004/46] | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, LU, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Olefinpolymerisationsverfahren | [2004/46] | English: | Olefin polymerization process | [2004/46] | French: | procédé de polymèrisation d'oléfines | [2004/46] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 27.08.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.12.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, DK, ES, FI, IE, LU, NL, PT, SE | 09.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/04] | 01.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/04] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96923561.3 / EP0835269 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.09.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.09.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.09.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.09.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.09.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.09.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.09.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.09.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.09.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.09.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3676523 (MASON RONALD F) [X] 1,8 * example -; claim - *; | [A]US3681315 (YAGI YOSHIHARU, et al) [A] 8-13* claim - *; | [XA]DE1793788 (STUDIENGESELLSCHAFT KOHLE MBH) [X] 8-13 * page 7; examples 14-33,35-57; claim - * * examples 43,54,56,57; claim - * [A] 1-7; | [A]US4716205 (KLABUNDE ULRICH [US]) [A] 1-13 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP0454231 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US5332794 (OHTSU TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9514048 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A] - JOHNSON, L. K. ET AL., "New Pd(II)- and Ni(II)-Based Catalysts for Polymerization of Ethylene and alpha-Olefins", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, (19950614), vol. 117, no. 23, XP002015954 [A] 1-13 * page 6414 - page 6415 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00128a054 | [A] - TAUBE R ET AL, "THE CATALYSIS OF THE STEREOSPECIFIC BUTADIENE POLYMERIZATION BY ALLYL NICKEL AND ALLYL LANTHANIDE COMPLEXES A MECHANISTIC COMPARISON", MACROMOLECULAR SYMPOSIA, (19950101), vol. 89, pages 393 - 409, XP000509182 [A] 1-13 | [A] - KLABUNDE U ET AL, "NICKEL CATALYSIS FOR ETHYLENE HOMO- AND CO-POLYMERIZATION", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS, LAUSANNE, CH, (19870702), vol. 41, no. 1/2, pages 123 - 134, XP008002524 [A] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-5102(87)80023-8 |