EP1509020 - Information processing apparatus, session recovery method, recording medium for storing session recovery program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2017/10] |
Former [2005/08] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yagi, Atsuko 7-1-202, Idasugiyamacho Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2017/10] |
Former [2005/08] | 01 /
Yagi, Atsuko 7-1-202, Idasugiyamacho, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/10] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/08] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04019050.6 | 11.08.2004 | [2005/08] | Priority number, date | JP20030294422 | 18.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003294422 | JP20040181383 | 18.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004181383 | [2005/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1509020 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1509020 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, // H04L29/06 | [2016/39] | CPC: |
H04L67/14 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/08] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2017/10] |
Former [2005/49] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, LI | ||
Former [2005/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Informationsverarbeitungsvorrichtung, Verfahren und Programmaufzeichnungsmedium zur Sitzungswiederherstellung | [2005/08] | English: | Information processing apparatus, session recovery method, recording medium for storing session recovery program | [2005/08] | French: | Dispositif de traitement d'informations, procédé et support d'enregistrement pour enregistrer un logiciel permettant la récupération d'une session | [2005/08] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 06.12.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.01.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.10.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.10.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 08.03.2017 | IT | 08.03.2017 | NL | 08.03.2017 | [2017/51] |
Former [2017/44] | ES | 08.03.2017 | |
NL | 08.03.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6018805 (MA HENRY CHI-TO [US], et al) [A] 1,5-7,9-12 * column 2, lines 14-21 * * column 4, line 36 - column 6, line 8 ** column 9, lines 40-63 *; | [XY]WO0161521 (MOLTEN MARKETS PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9,11 * abstract * * page 8, lines 8-25 * * page 20, lines 5-12 * * page 21, line 23 - page 22, line 29 * [Y] 5-7,10,12; | [X]US2002029269 (MCCARTY SCOTT F [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9,11 * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0099] * * paragraphs [0112] - [0114] * * paragraphs [0161] - [0167] *; | [A]US6362836 (SHAW ANDREW [GB], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 6, line 48 - column 7, line 25; figure 1 * * column 10, line 47 - column 11, line 2 * * column 12, lines 52-60 * * column 14, lines 27-39 *; | [Y]US6490610 (RIZVI HASAN [US], et al) [Y] 5-7,10,12 * column 1, lines 38-55 * * column 3, lines 33-42 * * column 4, lines 10-36 * * column 5, lines 15-27 * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 12 * * column 8, lines 34-46 * | by applicant | WO0161521 | US2002029269 | US6490610 |