EP1508846 - Constant pressure valve and method for cutting off a volume flow with such a constant pressure valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schulz, Dieter Hans-Böckler-Strasse 53 59302 Oelde / DE | [2005/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/08] | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/08] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 04019388.0 | 16.08.2004 | [2005/08] | Priority number, date | DE2003137689 | 16.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10337689 | [2005/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1508846 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1508846 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G05D16/02, G05D16/06 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
G05D16/0652 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/08] | G05D16/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, SE [2006/48] |
Former [2005/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Konstantdruckventil und Verfahren zum Absperren eines Volumenstromes durch ein solches Konstantdruckventil | [2005/08] | English: | Constant pressure valve and method for cutting off a volume flow with such a constant pressure valve | [2005/08] | French: | Vanne à pression constante et procédé pour couper un débit volumétrique au moyen d'une telle vanne à pression constante | [2005/08] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 03.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/36] | 20.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR741094 (KROMSCHRÖDER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [X] 1-3 * figure 1 * * page 2, line 17 - line 74 *; | [X]US2767725 (LONG HENRY A) [X] 1-3,6-8 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 30 - line 33 * * column 2, line 14 - column 4, line 26 *; | [A]US4126152 (KIRK DAVID B) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [X]US4549572 (WRIGHT DOLPH D [US]) [X] 1-6 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 13 - column 4, line 45 *; | [A]US5123436 (KOECHLEIN GREGG W [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 2,4-6 *; | [X]GB2253681 (INT GAS APPARATUS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-8 * figure 1 * * page 3 - page 4 * |