EP1512590 - Door unlocking controller and control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Jidosha Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 33-8, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8410 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JIDOSHA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 33-8, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8410 / JP | ||
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Jidosha Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 16-4, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8410 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoguchi, Tohru c/o MITSUBISHI JIDOSHA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 108-8410 / JP | [2009/32] |
Former [2005/10] | 01 /
Inoguchi, Tohru Mitsubishi Jidosha Kogyo K.K. 2-16-4, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8410 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/10] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04019585.1 | 18.08.2004 | [2005/10] | Priority number, date | JP20030297512 | 21.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003297512 | [2005/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1512590 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1512590 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/00, G07C9/00 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
B60R25/245 (EP,US);
E05B81/76 (KR);
E05B81/60 (KR);
G07C9/00309 (EP,US);
G07C2009/00333 (EP,US);
G07C2209/63 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/48] |
Former [2005/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Türentriegelungsvorrichtung und Steuerverfahren dafür | [2005/10] | English: | Door unlocking controller and control method thereof | [2005/10] | French: | Contrôleur de déverrouillage d'une porte et procédé de contrôle associé | [2005/10] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 20.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1107354 (VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE [FR]) [X] 1,3,4,6,8,10 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] ** paragraph [0021] *; | [X]US2003038732 (WATARAI SADANORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0043] * * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | JP2000073635 |