EP1580002 - Fluid supply having a fluid absorbing material cross-reference to related application [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Studer, Anthony D. 2151 Chicago St SE Albany, OR 97322 / US | 02 /
Almen, Kevin D. 3150 Angelo Jay Drive Albany, OR 97321 / US | 03 /
Benson, David J. 3075 Quail CT SE Albany, OR 97322 / US | 04 /
Hagen, David M. 1111 NW Grant Avenue Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | 05 /
Bybee, Cary R. P.O. Box 4014 Sanford, NC 27331 / US | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2005/39] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04019852.5 | 20.08.2004 | [2005/39] | Priority number, date | US20040811127 | 25.03.2004 Original published format: US 811127 | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1580002 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1580002 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | [2007/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1580002 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
B41J2/17513 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2008/17] |
Former [2005/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitszufuhr mit flüssigkeitsabsorbierendem Material | [2005/39] | English: | Fluid supply having a fluid absorbing material cross-reference to related application | [2005/39] | French: | Alimentation en fluide comprenant un materiau absorbeur de fluide | [2005/39] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 26.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4929969 (MORRIS BRIAN G [US]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * claim 1 ** page 6, column 2, line 40 - page 6, column 2, line 43 * |