EP1512703 - Use of copolymerisable surfactants in the emulsion polymerisation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/10] | Surfactant copolymerisable. | ||
[2010/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/27] | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Rheinpromenade 1 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Breuer, Wolfgang, Dr. Clara-Schumannstrasse 13 41352 Korschenbroich / DE | 02 /
Tintillier, Patrick 6, rue du Dr. Limoge 77310 Boissise le Roi / FR | [2005/10] | Application number, filing date | 04019875.6 | 21.08.2004 | [2005/10] | Priority number, date | DE2003140081 | 30.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10340081 | [2005/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1512703 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1512703 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08F222/20, C08F2/24 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
C08F2/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [2011/24] |
Former [2005/48] | BE, BG, DE, ES, FR, NL | ||
Former [2005/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verwendung copolymerisierbarer Tenside in der Emulsionspolymerisation | [2010/26] | English: | Use of copolymerisable surfactants in the emulsion polymerisation | [2010/26] | French: | Utilisation de tensio-actifs copolymerisables dans la polymerisation en emulsion | [2010/26] |
Former [2005/10] | Copolymerisierbare Tenside | ||
Former [2005/10] | Surfactant copolymerisable. | ||
Former [2005/10] | Tensio-actifs copolymerisables. | Examination procedure | 21.08.2004 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 20.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2006 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0248612 (CROWN DECORATIVE PROD LTD [GB]); | [DA]DE19831706 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) |