EP1516787 - Mounting system for a hood for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/28] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/12] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Köstler, Ulrich Am Eichenberg 25 85241 Hebertshausen / DE | 02 /
Tietel, Andreas Hans-Grässel-Weg 15B 81375 München / DE | 03 /
Fichtinger, Gerhard Sankt Martinstrasse 22 81541 München / DE | 04 /
Schmitt, Torsten Martin-Empl-Ring 6A 81829 München / DE | 05 /
Dockweiler, Achim Caroline-Herschel-Strasse 11 81829 München / DE | [2005/12] | Application number, filing date | 04020256.6 | 25.08.2004 | [2005/12] | Priority number, date | DE2003142717 | 16.09.2003 Original published format: DE 10342717 | [2005/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1516787 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/34 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
B60R21/34 (EP);
B60R2021/343 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/50] |
Former [2005/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anordnung einer Frontklappe an einem Fahrzeug | [2005/12] | English: | Mounting system for a hood for a vehicle | [2005/12] | French: | Dispositif pour le capot d'un véhicule | [2005/12] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 01.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 28.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JP2000108842 ; | [A]EP1104726 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1275567 (KIA MOTORS CORP [KR]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [X]DE10132656 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0026] *; | [A]GB2379481 (ITW LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000929), vol. 2000, no. 07, & JP2000108842 A 20000418 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [DA] 1-6 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2000108842 |