EP1517290 - Driving circuit for electroluminescent display device and its related method of operation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyazawa, Takashi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | [2005/12] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04020280.6 | 26.08.2004 | [2005/12] | Priority number, date | JP20030306804 | 29.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003306804 | JP20040191357 | 29.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004191357 | [2005/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1517290 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1517290 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
G09G3/3233 (EP,US);
G09G3/30 (KR);
G09G3/3291 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0819 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0852 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0866 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0251 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0254 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0256 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/48] |
Former [2005/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Treiber für elektrolumineszente Bildanzeigevorrichtung und Steuerverfahren dafür | [2005/12] | English: | Driving circuit for electroluminescent display device and its related method of operation | [2005/12] | French: | Circuit de commande pour un dispositif d'affichage électroluminescent et procédé de commande de celui-ci | [2005/12] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/45] | 23.10.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.09.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 28.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/45] | 23.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9848403 (SARNOFF CORP [US]) [X] 40,41 * page 6, line 15 - page 8, line 2; figure 3 *; | [X]US2003020705 (KONDO SHIGEKI [JP], et al) [X] 16-18,25* figure 9 *; | [X]US2003095087 (LIBSCH FRANK R [US], et al) [X] 8-15,39-41 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0023] - [0044] *; | [X] - SANFORD J L ET AL, "TFT AMOLED PIXEL CIRCUITS AND DRIVING METHODS", 2003 SID INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS. BALTIMORE, MD, MAY 20 - 22, 2003; [SID INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS], SAN JOSE, CA : SID, US, (20030520), pages 10 - 13, XP001171706 [X] 1-6,19,20,24,26,40,41 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005]; figures 5-7 * |