EP1515490 - Modularized power take-off systems for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Truck Intellectual Property Company, LLC 4201 Winfield Road, P.O. Box 1488 Warrenville, IL 60555 / US | [2008/27] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states International Truck Intellectual Property Company, LLC 4201 Winfield Road, P.O. Box 1488 Warrenville, IL 60555 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larson, Gerald L. 9603 W. Cove Court Fort Wayne IN 46804 / US | 02 /
Casey, Colin J. 6133 Southampton Fort Wayne IN 46814 / US | 03 /
Howard, Charles E. 12222 N 700 W. Silver Lake IN 46982 / US | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen, Rainer-Andreas Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Fresing / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | Kuhnen, Rainer Andreas, Dipl.-Ing. KUHNEN & WACKER Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 04020467.9 | 27.08.2004 | [2005/11] | Priority number, date | US20030659625 | 10.09.2003 Original published format: US 659625 | [2005/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1515490 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1515490 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/413, B60L1/00, B60R16/02, H02J1/14, G06F1/32 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
B60R16/03 (EP,US);
G06F1/3203 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2005/49] |
Former [2005/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Modulares Antriebskraftverteilungssystem eines Fahrzeugs | [2005/11] | English: | Modularized power take-off systems for vehicles | [2005/11] | French: | Système modulaire de la répartition de puissance pour véhicule | [2005/11] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 17.09.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 06.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 03.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.10.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.06.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6272402 (KELWASKI H EDWARD [US]) [X] 1-23 * column 3, line 49 - column 7, line 33; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2001050471 (MCCOY RICHARD W [US], et al) [A] 5,9-12,15-18,22,23* paragraph [0025]; figure 2 *; | [X]US2002007979 (WILSON ERIK C [US]) [X] 1-23 * paragraphs [0023] - [0032]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]WO02087053 (JAGUAR CARS [GB], et al) [X] 1-23 * page 6, column 18 - page 11, column 10; figures 1-3 * |