05.11.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] |
20.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] |
23.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] |
09.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
06.11.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] |
25.09.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] |
01.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] |
24.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] |
27.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] |
23.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] |
23.01.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] |
14.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] |
13.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] |
12.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] |
10.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
26.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] |
19.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
22.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] |
15.02.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
07.02.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.02.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.11.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.09.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.08.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] |
09.06.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.04.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.12.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.12.2006 |
First examination report |
|
09.09.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.07.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] |
07.07.2006 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] |
28.10.2005 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] |
07.10.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.11.2005 [2005/47] |
27.05.2005 |
Change - applicant |
published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] |
04.02.2005 |
Publication of search report |
published on 23.03.2005 [2005/12] |
28.01.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] |