EP1514864 - Difluoralkyl aromatic compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saltigo GmbH Business-Park Katzberg Katzbergstrasse 1 40764 Langenfeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states Saltigo GmbH Business-Park Katzberg Katzbergstrasse 1 40764 Langenfeld / DE | ||
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states Saltigo GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states Bayer Chemicals AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hilgers, Petra, Dr. Sandweg 10 51503 Rösrath / DE | 02 /
Marhold, Albrecht, Dr. Carl-Duisberg-Strasse 329 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | Wichmann, Birgid, et al LANXESS Deutschland GmbH LEX-IPR Kennedyplatz 1 50569 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | Wichmann, Birgid, et al LANXESS Deutschland GmbH LIP IPR Q 18 51369 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04020499.2 | 28.08.2004 | [2005/11] | Priority number, date | DE2003141534 | 09.09.2003 Original published format: DE 10341534 | [2005/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1514864 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1514864 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | [2005/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1514864 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07C211/29, C07C255/50, C07C33/46 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
C07C51/15 (EP,US);
C07C17/12 (EP,US);
C07C211/29 (EP,US);
C07C25/13 (EP,US);
C07C33/46 (EP,US);
C07C51/60 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/12, C07C25/13 (EP,US);
C07C51/15, C07C63/70 (US,EP);
C07C51/60, C07C63/70 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/11] | Title | German: | Difluoralkylaromaten | [2005/11] | English: | Difluoralkyl aromatic compounds | [2005/11] | French: | Composés aromatiques difluoro alcoylés | [2005/11] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 05.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.03.2008 | CZ | 19.03.2008 | DK | 19.03.2008 | EE | 19.03.2008 | FI | 19.03.2008 | PL | 19.03.2008 | RO | 19.03.2008 | SI | 19.03.2008 | SK | 19.03.2008 | TR | 19.03.2008 | BG | 19.06.2008 | SE | 19.06.2008 | GR | 20.06.2008 | PT | 26.08.2008 | AT | 28.08.2008 | LU | 28.08.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | HU | 20.09.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 19.03.2008 | |
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
TR | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
AT | 28.08.2008 | ||
LU | 28.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
HU | 20.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 19.03.2008 | |
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
AT | 28.08.2008 | ||
LU | 28.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
HU | 20.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 19.03.2008 | |
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
AT | 28.08.2008 | ||
LU | 28.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/50] | CY | 19.03.2008 | |
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
AT | 28.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/44] | CY | 19.03.2008 | |
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 19.03.2008 | |
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 19.03.2008 | |
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | CZ | 19.03.2008 | |
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | CZ | 19.03.2008 | |
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | CZ | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | FI | 19.03.2008 | |
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 19.03.2008 | |
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | FI | 19.03.2008 | |
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 19.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0245690 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 8* Seite 16, Zeile 30-33 *; | [A]US5547975 (TALLEY JOHN J [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * Spalte 55, Schema IX; Spalte 58, Step 2 *; | [A] - QIU, JIAN ET AL, "2,6-Difluorophenol as a Bioisostere of a Carboxylic Acid: Bioisosteric Analogs of .gamma.-Aminobutyric Acid", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY , 42(2), 329-332 CODEN: JMCMAR; ISSN: 0022-2623, (1999), XP002305237 [A] 1,9 * Seite 330, Schema 1; Seite 331, Herstellung von (6) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm980435l |