EP1504834 - Distributor device for use in metal casting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: LI | published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pyrotek Engineering Materials Limited Garamonde Drive Wymbush Milton Keynes MK8 8LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states Pyrotek Engineering Materials Limited Garamonde Drive Wymbush Milton Keynes MK8 8LN / GB | ||
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states Pyrotek Engineering Materials Limited Garamonde Drive Wymbush, Milton Keynes MK8 8LN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tremblay, Silvain 3824 De Vienne, Jonquiere Quebec G7X 9S3 / CA | 02 /
Vincent, Mark 19 Hydrus Drive Leighton Buzzard LU7 8UL / GB | [2005/22] |
Former [2005/06] | 01 /
Tremblay, Silvain 3824 De Vienne, Jonquire Quebec G7X 9S3 / CA | ||
02 /
Vincent, Mark 19 Hydrus Drive Leighton Buzzard LU7 8UL / GB | Representative(s) | Raynor, Simon Mark Murgitroyd & Company Milton Keynes Studio H1B 297 Upper Fourth Street Witan Studios Milton Keynes MK9 1EH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | Raynor, Simon Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Midsummer House, 413 Midsummer Boulevard Central Milton Keynes MK9 3BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 04020511.4 | 04.08.2000 | [2005/06] | Priority number, date | GB19990018350 | 05.08.1999 Original published format: GB 9918350 | [2005/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1504834 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1504834 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B22D35/04, B22D41/50, C22B21/06, C22B21/00, B22C9/08, B22D7/12, B22D11/103, B22D11/119 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
B22D41/003 (EP,US);
B22C9/082 (EP,US);
B22D11/103 (EP,US);
B22D11/119 (EP,US);
B22D35/04 (EP,US);
B22D41/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/06] | Title | German: | Verteilervorrichtung zur Verwendung beim Metallgiessen | [2005/06] | English: | Distributor device for use in metal casting | [2005/06] | French: | Dispositif de répartition utilisé dans la coulée de métal liquide | [2005/18] |
Former [2005/06] | Dispositif de distribution utilise dans la fonte de metal | Examination procedure | 28.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 25.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00953275.5 / EP1198314 | Divisional application(s) | EP05013742.1 / EP1591177 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 26.10.2005 | CY | 26.10.2005 | IT | 26.10.2005 | ES | 06.02.2006 | PT | 27.03.2006 | [2015/26] |
Former [2009/02] | BE | 26.10.2005 | |
CY | 26.10.2005 | ||
IT | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/43] | BE | 26.10.2005 | |
IT | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | BE | 26.10.2005 | |
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | LI | 26.10.2005 | |
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | PT | 27.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3111732 (SCHROER CHARLES A, et al) [A] 1-13 * column 5, line 22 - line 31; figures 2,3; claim 1 *; | [DA]US5207974 (YUN DAVID I [US]) [DA] 1-13 * claims 1-20 *; | [A]US5244032 (BANKSDEN DAVID L [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figures 5-7; claims 1-10 *; | [AD]US5871660 (XU DONG [US], et al) [AD] 1-13* claims 1-20 *; | [PA]WO9944719 (PROD IND DE HAUTE TEMPERATURE [CA]) [PA] 1-11 * figure 9; claims 8-12 * |