22.05.2015 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] |
05.12.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] |
21.09.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] |
24.11.2006 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2006 [2006/52] |
01.09.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] |
04.08.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] |
21.07.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2006 [2006/34] |
14.07.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] |
19.05.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] |
09.09.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.10.2005 [2005/43] |
09.09.2005 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 26.10.2005 [2005/43] |
01.09.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.09.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.08.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.07.2005 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] |
19.04.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.04.2005 |
Change - inventor |
published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] |
18.03.2005 |
Change - French title |
published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] |
11.02.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.03.2005 [2005/13] |
24.12.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] |
08.09.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|