EP1629958 - Barrel processor having a degassing means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plastik Textile S.p.a. Via Tonale 74 24061 Albano S. Alessandro (Bergamo) / IT | [2006/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cattaneo, Gianangelo Via San Pantaleone 5 Scanzorosciate, Bergamo / IT | 02 /
Ponzielli, Giuseppe Via Vararo 57 21033 Cittglio (VA) / IT | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | Ritscher, Thomas, et al Ritscher & Partner AG Resirain 1 8125 Zollikerberg / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | Ritscher, Thomas, et al Ritscher & Partner AG Zollikerstrasse 19 8702 Zollikon/Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2006/09] | Ritscher, Thomas Ritscher & Partner AG, Zollikerstrasse 19, Postfach 372 8029 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 04020526.2 | 30.08.2004 | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1629958 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/76 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
B29C48/767 (EP);
B29C48/27 (EP);
B29C48/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/09] | Title | German: | Zylinderprozessor oder Extruder mit einer Vorrichtung zur Entgasung | [2006/09] | English: | Barrel processor having a degassing means | [2006/09] | French: | Processeur cylindrique ou extrudeuse présentant un moyen de dégazage | [2006/09] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/21] | 09.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.10.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08120283 ; | [Y]JPH11300811 ; | [A]JPS58175641 ; | [XY]US3078512 (DE HAVEN CLARK G) [X] 1,3-5,7 * column 3, line 47 - line 74 * * figure -; claims 2-8 * [Y] 2,6,9,10; | [X]US3535737 (HENDRY JAMES W) [X] 1,3-5,7,8 * column 5, line 31 - column 6, line 33; figures 3-5 *; | [X]US4120050 (CRAIG GREGORY C, et al) [X] 1,3-5,7,8 * abstract * * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 17 * * figure - * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 1996, no. 09, & JP08120283 A 19960514 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1,5,7 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 02, & JP11300811 A 19991102 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD:THE) [Y] 2,6,9,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840119), vol. 008, no. 012, Database accession no. (M - 269), & JP58175641 A 19831014 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KK) [A] 2,6,9,10 * abstract * |