EP1498089 - Preparation for repairing cartilage defects or cartilage/bone defects in human or animal joints [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zimmer GmbH Sulzer Allee 8 8404 Winterthur / CH | [2005/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nadler, Daniel Alte Rutschwilerstrasse 91 8442 Hettlingen ZH / CH | 02 /
Bittmann, Pedro Seminarstrasse 46 8057 Zürich / CH | 03 /
Akens, Margarete UHN Princess Margaret Hosp.7-408 610 University Avenue M5G 2M9 Toronto, ON / CA | 04 /
von Rechenberg, Brigitte Mühlemattstrasse 15 B 8903 Birmensdorf / CH | 05 /
Auer, Jörg Ammerswilerstrasse 5 5600 Lenzburg / CH | [2005/16] |
Former [2005/03] | 01 /
Nadler, Daniel Alte Rutschwilerstrasse 91 8442 Hettlingen ZH / CH | ||
02 /
Bittmann, Pedro Seminarstrasse 46 8057 Zürich / CH | |||
03 /
Akens, Margarete Binzwiesenstrasse 12 8057 Zürich / CH | |||
04 /
von Rechenberg, Brigitte Mühlemattstrasse 15 B 8903 Birmensdorf / CH | |||
05 /
Auer, Jörg Ammerswilerstrasse 5 5600 Lenzburg / CH | Representative(s) | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Hagenholzstrasse 85 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2005/03] | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 768 8029 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 04020622.9 | 12.12.2000 | [2005/03] | Priority number, date | CH19990002296 | 15.12.1999 Original published format: CH 229699 | [2005/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1498089 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/30, A61F2/28, A61L27/00, A61L27/12, A61B17/16, A61B17/32, A61F2/46 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
A61B17/32053 (EP,US);
A61F2/28 (EP,US);
A61F2/30756 (EP,US);
A61F2/4601 (EP,US);
A61B17/1637 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00969 (EP,US);
A61F2002/2839 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30032 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30062 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30113 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30143 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30153 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30154 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30156 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30172 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30224 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30233 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30299 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30327 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30733 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30751 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30759 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30808 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30929 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30971 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4631 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4649 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4685 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0004 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0006 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0017 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0019 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0021 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0023 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0052 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0069 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0093 (EP,US);
A61F2240/001 (EP,US);
A61F2250/003 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/03] | Title | German: | Präparat für die Reparatur von Knorpel- oder Knorpel/Knochen-Defekten in menschlichen oder tierischen Gelenken | [2005/03] | English: | Preparation for repairing cartilage defects or cartilage/bone defects in human or animal joints | [2005/03] | French: | Préparation pour la réparation d'anomalies cartilagineuses ou cartilagino-osseuses affectant des articulations humaines ou animales | [2005/03] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 20.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/51] | 23.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/51] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00979315.9 / EP1237511 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2933174 (SULZER AG) [A] 2-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0493698 (HAERLE ANTON [DE]); | [A]US5152791 (HAKAMATSUKA YASUHARU [JP], et al); | [A]WO9315694 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9426211 (GROSS ULRICH [DE]); | [A]DE19503504 (METRIMED ORVOSI MUESZERGYARTO [HU]); | [A]WO9624310 (HOSPITAL FOR JOINT DISEASES OR [US]) [A] 7 * claims 2,5 *; | [A]WO9624302 (SCHWARTZ ROBERT E [US]); | [A]US5591234 (KIRSCH AXEL [DE]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [DA]EP0768332 (SULZER INNOTEC AG [CH]) [DA] 9 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9746665 (SULZER ORTHOPEDICS LTD [CH], et al); | [A]EP0815809 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON PROFESSIONAL [US]) [A] 1 * column 8, line 3 - line 31; figure 3 *; | [A]WO9856317 (BIONX IMPLANTS OY [FI]) [A] 1 * page 13, line 24 - page 14, line 12; figures 11A,11B; claims 4-6 * |