EP1535816 - Central buffer coupling for railway vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Turbo Scharfenberg GmbH & Co. KG Gottfried-Linke-Strasse 205 38239 Salzgitter-Watenstedt / DE | [2006/28] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Voith Turbo Scharfenberg GmbH & Co. KG Gottfried-Linke Strasse 205 38239 Salzgitter-Watenstedt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mattschull, Volker, Dipl.-Ing. Wilhelm Bode Str. 22 38106 Braunschweig / DE | 02 /
Radewagen, Christian Im Kirchhof 19 38228 Salzgitter / DE | [2005/22] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Kay, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | Rupprecht, Kay, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04020684.9 | 31.08.2004 | [2005/22] | Priority number, date | DE2003155640 | 28.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10355640 | [2005/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1535816 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1535816 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B61G7/14, B61G7/12 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
B61G7/12 (EP,US);
B61G11/16 (EP,US);
B61G7/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, PL, SE [2005/35] |
Former [2005/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mittelpufferkupplung für Schienenfahrzeuge | [2005/22] | English: | Central buffer coupling for railway vehicles | [2005/22] | French: | Attelage central pour véhicules ferroviaires | [2005/22] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 23.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/43] | IT | 12.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0358052 (BERGISCHE STAHLINDUSTRIE [DE]) [A] 4,5* column 2, line 16 - line 40; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0640519 (SCHARFENBERGKUPPLUNG GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,4,7-9 * column 2, line 38 - column 4, line 22; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1112909 (WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE CO [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1129920 (SCHWAB VERKEHRSTECHNIK AG [CH]) [A] 1,4,7-9 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0015]; figures 1-7 * | by applicant | DE3632578 | DE3228941 |