EP1633176 - Shock resistant mounting for small display screen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.02.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Chao 508 Mountbatten Avenue, Waterloo Ontario N2T 2T8 / CA | 02 /
Phillips, Robert William 260 Lion's Court, Waterloo Ontario N2L 6M8 / CA | 03 /
Kyowski, Timothy Herbert 19 Childerhose Crescent, Brantford Ontario N3P 1Z8 / CA | [2006/10] | Representative(s) | Asquith, Anthony Anthony Asquith & Co. 123 Main Street Scholes, Leeds LS15 4DP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/10] | Asquith, Anthony Anthony Asquith & Co 328 Leeds Road Scholes Leeds, LS15 4DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04020960.3 | 03.09.2004 | [2006/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1633176 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1633176 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H05K5/00, H04M1/02, G02F1/13, H04B1/08, H04B1/38, G06F1/16 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
H04M1/0266 (EP);
G02F1/133308 (EP);
G06F1/1626 (EP);
G06F1/1637 (EP);
G02F1/133317 (EP);
G02F2201/503 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/10] | Extension states | AL | 07.09.2006 | HR | 07.09.2006 | LT | 07.09.2006 | LV | 07.09.2006 | MK | 07.09.2006 | Title | German: | Schockfeste Montagevorrichtung für kleinen Anzeigeschirm | [2006/10] | English: | Shock resistant mounting for small display screen | [2006/10] | French: | Dispositif de montage antichoc pour un écran d'affichage petit | [2006/10] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 06.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.04.2007 | BE | 25.04.2007 | CH | 25.04.2007 | CY | 25.04.2007 | CZ | 25.04.2007 | DK | 25.04.2007 | EE | 25.04.2007 | FI | 25.04.2007 | IT | 25.04.2007 | LI | 25.04.2007 | NL | 25.04.2007 | PL | 25.04.2007 | RO | 25.04.2007 | SI | 25.04.2007 | SK | 25.04.2007 | TR | 25.04.2007 | BG | 25.07.2007 | SE | 25.07.2007 | GR | 26.07.2007 | ES | 05.08.2007 | IE | 03.09.2007 | LU | 03.09.2007 | PT | 25.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | HU | 26.10.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
CY | 25.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
EE | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
IT | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
NL | 25.04.2007 | ||
PL | 25.04.2007 | ||
RO | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
IE | 03.09.2007 | ||
LU | 03.09.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
CY | 25.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
EE | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
IT | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
NL | 25.04.2007 | ||
PL | 25.04.2007 | ||
RO | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
IE | 03.09.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
EE | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
IT | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
NL | 25.04.2007 | ||
PL | 25.04.2007 | ||
RO | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
IE | 03.09.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
IT | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
NL | 25.04.2007 | ||
PL | 25.04.2007 | ||
RO | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
IE | 03.09.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
IT | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
NL | 25.04.2007 | ||
PL | 25.04.2007 | ||
RO | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
IT | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
NL | 25.04.2007 | ||
PL | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
NL | 25.04.2007 | ||
PL | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
NL | 25.04.2007 | ||
PL | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
NL | 25.04.2007 | ||
PL | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
PL | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
PL | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
PL | 25.04.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
PL | 25.04.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CH | 25.04.2007 | |
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 05.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11202787 ; | [A]US6181548 (WHEELER CRAIG S [US]) [A] 1,7 * column 1, lines 5-11 * * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 9 ** figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2003189681 (HAN KWANG KUK [KR], et al) [A] 1,7 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0047] * * figures 1-4 *; | [E]EP1499095 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [E] 1,7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0005] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0015] * * figures 1-6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991029), vol. 1999, no. 12, & JP11202787 A 19990730 (HITACHI LTD; HITACHI DEVICE ENG CO LTD) [A] 1,7 * abstract * |